Jack v. Grose
Plaintiff: |
John Jack and Tri-State Disposal, LLC |
Defendant: |
Dean Grose and South Park Ventures, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00633 |
Filed: |
June 30, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Columbus Office |
County: |
ADAMS |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly A. Jolson |
Presiding Judge: |
Algenon L. Marbley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 25, 2019 |
Filing
163
ORDER denying (135) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (137) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (138) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (139) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 2: 16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ; denying (96) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (98) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (99) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (100) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/25/2019. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ, 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ (cw)
|
March 20, 2019 |
Filing
162
ORDER finding as moot (136) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (161) Motion to Dismiss Defendant Noble Zickefoose in case 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ; finding as moot (97) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (117) Motion to Dismiss Defendant noble Zickefoose in case 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/20/2019. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ, 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ (cw)
|
June 25, 2018 |
Filing
125
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (108) Motion to Compel in case 2:16-cv-633; (75) Motion to Compel in case 2:17-cv-808-ALM-KAJ. An in-person status conference must be held prior to the filing of any discovery motion in this ca se. Counsel are ORDERED to review the introductory statement on civility and to certify such review via joint email within 7 days.Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2018. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ, 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ (ew)
|
May 21, 2018 |
Filing
113
OPINION AND ORDER denying (96) Motion to Compel; granting (106) Motion for Leave to File in case 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ; denying (62) Motion to Compel; granting (71) Motion for Leave to File; denying (78) Motion to Strike in case 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ. The current expert report deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/21/2018. (ew)
|
March 5, 2018 |
Filing
82
ORDER denying (28) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/5/2018. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ, 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ (cw)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing
71
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/4/2018. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ, 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ (ew)
|
December 13, 2017 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting in part 62 Motion to Compel: Documents responsive to Plaintiff's subpoena to the Interested Parties must be produced with an "Attorney's Eyes Only" designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/13/2017. (ew)
|
March 13, 2017 |
Filing
25
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count One is DISMISSED as to Dean Grose only; Count Two is DISMISSED as to Dean Grose only; and Count Three is DISMISSED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/13/2017. (cw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?