Madej et al v. Athens County Engineer
Plaintiff: Cynthia Madej and Robert Madej
Defendant: Athens County Engineer
Case Number: 2:2016cv00658
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ATHENS
Presiding Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for an Injunction Pending Appeal. (ECF No. 150.) Specifically, the Court REINSTATES the injunction for ONE WEEK, which will provide Plaintiffs the opportunity to move the Sixth Circuit for relief. See Fed. R. App. P. 8. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/16/2018. (plb)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 117 Motion for Summary Judgment. The claims of Plaintiffs are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the preliminary injunction is VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/17/2018. (cmw)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER overruling Plaintiffs' Objection and denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay 37 ; denying in part, denying as moot in part, and denying without prejudice to refiling in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Stay the IME 38 ; and denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Decision on Motion to Stay 40 . Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 09/19/2017. (dh1)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/11/2017. (agm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madej et al v. Athens County Engineer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens County Engineer
Represented By: Julianna Clark
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: Maribeth Meluch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Madej
Represented By: Sky Pettey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Madej
Represented By: Sky Pettey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?