Coach, Inc., et al. v. Bromelow, et al.
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc. and Coach Services, Inc.
Defendant: Melanie Bromelow, Greg Bromelow and Mel's Imagination
Case Number: 2:2016cv00729
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: BELMONT
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Substitute Party. Tapestry, Inc. and Coach IP Holdings, LLC added. Coach Services, Inc. and Coach, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 14, 2018. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DISMISSING without prejudice Bromelow from this action. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/1/2017. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The CLERK is DIRECTED to ENTER DEFAULT against Defendant Mels Imagination in this matter. Plaintiffs request for default judgment (ECF No. 22 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/6/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coach, Inc., et al. v. Bromelow, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Susan Allison
Represented By: Matthew C O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Susan Allison
Represented By: Matthew C O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Bromelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bromelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel's Imagination
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?