Moore v. Central Ohio Drug Enforcement Task Force (Code TF) et al

Plaintiff: Chad A. Moore
Defendant: Central Ohio Drug Enforcement Task Force (Code TF), Kyle Boerstler, Greg Collins and Licking County Ohio Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2016cv00987
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: LICKING
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 22 in that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/26/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 6, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Central Ohio Drug Enforcement Task Force (Code TF), Licking County Ohio Sheriff's Department, Kyle Boerstler and Greg Collins in that it is RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 3/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/6/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 25, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court finds that Plaintiff may proceed with his Fourth and Fourteenth Amendment claims for allegedly including false statements in the search warrant application for Plaintiffs property and residence. It is ORDERED tha t the U.S. Marshal serve each Defendant. Defendants are ORDERED to respond within 45 days of service. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 25, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Central Ohio Drug Enforcement Task Force (Code TF) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Ohio Drug Enforcement Task Force (Code TF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Boerstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Licking County Ohio Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?