Johnson v. United States
Plaintiff: Roger Carlton Johnson
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 2:2016cv01064
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION and ORDER adopting 26 the Report and Recommendation; granting 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/18/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS denying 22 Motion to Amend, granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/25/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS 7 Complaint be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 5/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/11/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting 4 the Report and Recommendation; denying 1 and 3 Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/13/16. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 and 3 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is RECOMMENDED that the motions be denied. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/15/2016. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Carlton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?