Wilson et al v. Chagrin Valley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carol A. Wilson and Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Pension Plan, Apprenticeship and Training Plan and Education and Safety Plan
Defendant: Chagrin Valley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01084
Filed: November 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Vacate the hearing scheduled for July 16, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/16/2018. (cmw)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION AND ORDER granting 94 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The hearing previously scheduled for 6/25/2018 is VACATED and reset for 7/11/2018 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/20/2018. (ew) Modified opinion status on 6/21/2018 (ew).
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - re 85 Motion to Stay, filed by Chagrin Valley Steel Erectors, Inc.. The Court will hold a hearing on June 6, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom number 2. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/21/2018. (mas)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION AND ORDER granting 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 42 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File; denying 59 Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/27/2018. (mas)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION AND ORDER granting 37 Chagrin Valley Steel Erector's 56(d) Motion. Chagrin Valley has sufficiently demonstrated how the materials it hopes to obtain with further discovery would help it oppose summary judgment. However, discovery cl osed nearly one month prior to Plaintiffs and Third-Party Defendant filing their Motion for Summary Judgment. It is unclear whether Chagrin Valley is entitled to the discovery it seeks, or whether it is appropriately discoverable information. Wheth er Chagrin Valley's discovery request is meritorious will be determined by Magistrate Judge Jolson. Until her decision, the Court HOLDS IN ABEYANCE the Motion for Summary Judgment of Plaintiffs and Third-Party Defendant Justin Helmick. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/10/2017. (dh1)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; denying 20 Motion to Strike ; granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim and Second Amended Third-Party Complaint, Instanter. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/12/2017. (mas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Chagrin Valley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Wilson
Represented By: Bryan Charles Barch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Pension Plan, Apprenticeship and Training Plan and Education and Safety Plan
Represented By: Bryan Charles Barch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chagrin Valley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?