Shah v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mukesh R Shah, M.D.
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01124
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: George C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION AND ORDER granting 61 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 2/19/2019. (ds)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/22/2018. (ew)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - Plaintiffs request to produce certain documents is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 27, 2017. (jlk)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 35 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel for an In Camera Inspection of Documents. Defendants are ORDERED to submit for in camera review WITHIN 7 DAYS the claim notes identified in Defendants privilege log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/19/2017. (jlk)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 32 Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 8/2/17. (sem)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mukesh R Shah, M.D.
Represented By: Mark David Landes
Represented By: John Stephen Teetor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett K Bacon
Represented By: Olivia Lin Southam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?