Boards of Trustees of Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs v. Solid Rock Construction Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs
Defendant: Solid Rock Construction Solutions, LLC, Solid Rock Construction Services, LLC and Solid Rock Construction Development Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01196
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; GRANTING Motion for Default Judgment and AWARDING attorney's fees and costs. DISMISSING without prejudice claims against defendants Solid Rock Construction Services, LLC and Solid Rock Development Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/12/2017. (cw)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 10 MOTION for Default Judgment against Solid Rock Construction Solutions, LLC filed by Boards of Trustees of Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs that it is RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Default Judgment be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 4/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/28/17. (sem)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Compel. Defendants Solid Rock Construction Solutions, LLC, Solid Rock Construction Services, LLC and Solid Rock Development Services, LLC through an authorized officer, are ordered to appear for deposition on the 28th day of February, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. and to produce the payroll documents requested in Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/10/2017. (agm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs v. Solid Rock Construction Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs
Represented By: Steven Louis Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Rock Construction Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Rock Construction Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Rock Construction Development Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?