Elliott v. First Federal Community Bank of Bucyrus
Plaintiff: George Ralph Elliott
Defendant: First Federal Community Bank of Bucyrus
Case Number: 2:2017cv00042
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: UNION
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Vacate Briefing Schedule. The September 14 Supplemental Briefing Order is hereby VACATED. Upon a final foreclosure sale, the parties are DIRECTED to submit a motion dismissing the matter; in addition, or alternatively, the parties may request a status conference before this Court to discuss further scheduling and matters in this case, if needed. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/22/2020. (cw)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 86 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 86 Motion to Stay. The steps outlined in this Courts Order & Opinion 81 at §III.D (Foreclosure) are hereby STAYED pending appeal. This stay shall remain in effect until the Sixth Circuit has addressed this matter or until the time to appeal this Courts Order has elapsed, whichever is later. This Court will lift this stay upon Motion by the party seeking its dissolution. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/25/2019. (cw)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/26/2019. (cw)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Defendant has agreed to withdraw its pending Motion for Summary Judgment 42 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Defendant's Motion from the pending motions list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 12, 2018. (jlk)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File; denying 24 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 9, 2018. (jlk)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 36 Motion to File Document Under Seal and granting 38 Motion for Reconsideration. If it is possible to do so, Defendant is ORDERED to file on the public docket redacted copies of these exhibits Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 1, 2018. (jlk)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 31, 2018. (jlk)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/8/2017. (agm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. First Federal Community Bank of Bucyrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ralph Elliott
Represented By: Aaron Edmund Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Community Bank of Bucyrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?