Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. 171.54 Acres of land, more or less, in Fairfield, Hocking, Monroe, Morgan, Muskingum, Noble, Perry, and Vinton et al
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Defendant: 171.54 Acres of land, more or less, in Fairfield, Hocking, Monroe, Morgan, Muskingum, Noble, Perry, and Vinton, Heirs of Marcella D. Allen, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Heirs and Assigns of Rolland D. Barringer, County of Muskingum, Ohio, Linda M Kirkbride, Donna B Mahon, Heirs of Guy P. Shepperd, Donald M Kirkbride, Heirs of Deborah Truex, Trustee Raymond J. North, III, John F Bentz, Heirs of James Appleman, Don Michael Tucker, John Bennett, Jackson County Water Company, Dorothy E Kidney, William C Kiener, Heirs of Cyrus Truxall, Stacy Craig, The Golden Rule Oil and Gas Company, Gary A Rubel, The Cabin, LLC, CNX Marine Terminals, Inc, D&D Property Two, LLC, Verna E Forst, Carrie Parker, Joseph L Kiener, Pamela Ensinger, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Farm Credit Services of Mid-America, FLCA, Heirs of Mary Appleman Fletcher, The Ohio Fuel Supply Company, Bluegrass Pipeline Company, LLC, Mary Ann McGreevy, Heirs of Elma A. McPeek, Elise Rorrer, Mary Evelyn Bennett, CNX Gas Company, LLC, Carrizo (Utica) LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission LP, Ohio Power Company, Melissa L Smith, Patrick W Allen, Pennzoil-Quaker State Company, Heirs of Bertha M. Barringer, Oxford Mining Company, LLC, Dorothy Tague Racher, Robert G Tague, Heirs and Assigns of Georgia C. Calhoun, Charles R Bennett, Snyder and Swanson, Inc., Helen J Appleman, Guernsey Petroleum Corporation, George Bennett, Debra Kay Hall, B & N Coal, Inc., Heirs and Assigns of Gladys E. Hoover Bartimus, Michael D Bennett, Bill Barron, Switzer Water Association, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Deborah Day, Diane L Persinger, Koehler Knob Dairy Farm, LLC, County of Perry, Ohio, Richard Hinkle, Heirs and Assigns of Bessie M. Phillips, Bonna J Sims, Vivian Dillion, Roberta Jane Hubbell, Pin Oak Energy Partners, LLC, Heirs of Leona Appleman, Martin A Hutchins, Barbara Hinkle, Consol Mining Company, Thomas R Persinger, Heirs and Assigns of Ruth A. Welsh, Eclipse Resources - Ohio, LLC, Barbara J Hutchins, Mary T Wolf, Leona Landerman, Monica Brothers, Charles W Owen, Jr., Peter R Kiener, David Craig, Temple Oil and Gas Company, Heirs of Kenneth Paul Holcomb, Michelle Kiener Brooks, Olds Investments, LLC, Daniel P Dick, Heirs of Mary Appleman, Jeanie Enterprises, LLC, Heirs of Nelda Maxine Amidon, Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative, Inc., Robert Hinkle, Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, HCR Holdings, LLC, William Joseph Hillis, David L Smith, The Peoples National Bank, Melzia Lee Flowers, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Fairfield Federal Savings and Loan Association of Lancaster, James A Bennett, Nancy S Rubel, Pamela Sidewell, Solid Rock Energy, Inc., Patricia Ann Griego, Shelly and Sands, Inc., County of Monroe, Ohio, Connie Coleman, Jon Eichelberger, Heirs of Mary M. Daugherty, David A Waldron, The East Ohio Gas Company, Heirs of Elma Rosella Adaline Justice, Heirs of John Shepperd, Heritage Coal Company, LLC, Kathryn E Owen, Trustee Vernon L. Kirkbride, Heirs and Assigns of Catherine I. Daugherty, Robert E Appleman, Louis Herod Bedford, T.E. Truex, Patty A Smith, Paul E Dietrich, United Telephone Company of Ohio, Terry Barron, Heirs of Noreen Luebben Henderon, James Day, Michael E Aberegg, Sr., Laura M Dalton, Freda M Rigby, Margaret E Davies, Jeffrey A Paczewski, Five Starr Farms, LLC, David Scott Owen, Heirs and assigns of Cletus Appleman, David Patrick Dalton, Citizens National Bank of Woodsfield, Heirs of Howard Shepperd, Rosemary Tague Mackin, Trustee Mark J Howdyshell, The Sunday Creek Coal Company, Mary C Appleman Chapman, Donna Jean Pittman Bedford, Daisy Smith, Heirs and Assigns of John Cook, Mary J. Storts Goddard heirs, Heirs of Elizabeth Timerlake, Robert E Bennett, Ulysses Grant Coleman, Katherine Anderson, Dorothy Hupman, Heirs and Assigns of Ethel Phillips, Joseph Lee David Smith, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Carrie M Dick, Heirs of Harvey M. Berkley, Heirs of W.P. Beaver, Deborah Aberegg, James T Bentz, G-R Contracting, Inc., Eclipse Resources I, LP, Heirs of George Rice, Harold R Aspery, Heirs of Marian L. Stockdale, Erik Bennett, David A. Waldron & Associates, Inc., Susan Kiener Murray, Middlefield Banking Company, Heirs and Assigns of Edna F. Jones, Paul Smith, H. William Boltres, Steve Kramer, Kathryn Chester, Karl Thompson, Sandra A Dietrich, Mary Helmers, John D Mahon, CNX RCPC, LLC, Gary L Harvey, Union Savings Bank, David P Tague, Hess Ohio Developments, LLC, Melvin D Tucker, Sergeant Stone, Inc., Heirs of Marjorie L. Bierie, Kingston Oil Corporation, Russel Stickney, Heirs and Assigns of Ernestine L. Lowrey, Jeri Barron, Tri-State Reclamation, Ltd., Willard Hinkle, Heirs of Benjamin Stackhouse, Sunnyhill Coal Sales Company, John Truex, Heirs of R.J. McGonagle, Barbara I Anderson and Beverly DeCoster
Interested Party: Craig Paynter, Keith W Schneider and Shawn Judge
Case Number: 2:2017cv00070
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43:945a
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER BY COMMISSION CHAIR REGARDING STATUS UPDATE ON ALL DEFENDANTS (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 12, 2021 Filing 275 NOTICE BY COMMISSION CHAIR RE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND FIRM AFFILIATION (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER OF COMMISSION CHAIR ON SERGEANT STONE HEARING DATE AND FORMAT. (jk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 273 BRIEF re #271 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 272 BRIEF re #271 Notice (Other) by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Zidar, Rachelle)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER OF COMMISSION CHAIR VACATING HEARING DATE AND ORDERING BRIEFING (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTATION ORDER Granting #266 Motion to substitute David M. Fedder as Columbia's Trial Attorney in place of his law partner, John R. Haug. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/22/2020. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 20, 2020 Filing 269 Witness List by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Fedder, David)
October 20, 2020 Filing 268 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Regarding Documents and Admissibility) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER OF COMMISSION CHAIR SUBSTITUTING ALTERNATE COMMISSIONER (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 20, 2020 Filing 266 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Motion for Leave to Substitute Trial Attorney) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of David M. Fedder) (Fedder, David)
October 20, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. re #253 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jan C. Hutwelker, 262 Order on Motion for Order to Remove Confidentiality Designation of Documents Produced by Plaintiff in Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right-of-Way Use Procedure) (Panza, Richard)
October 20, 2020 Filing 264 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. re 262 Order on Motion for Order to, #254 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right-of-Way Use Procedure) (Panza, Richard)
October 19, 2020 Filing 263 Witness List by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Panza, Richard)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTION ORDER granting #256 Motion for Order to Remove Confidentiality Designation of Documents Produced by Plaintiff in Discovery, with agreement of Plaintiff (ECF No. 260). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/16/2020. (EPD)
October 16, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE : The Status Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. (sln)
October 15, 2020 Filing 260 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #256 MOTION for Order to Remove Confidentiality Designation of Documents Produced by Plaintiff in Discovery (Fedder, David)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER - This matter is set for a telephonic status conference on October 16, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and Defendants Sergeant Stone, Inc.; Black Hawk Land and Resources; and B & N Coal, Inc. only are directed to call 1-877-336-1280, and enter access code, 7598806#, followed by security code 1234#. This conference is limited solely to the matter of Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.s motion relating to confidentiality designations (ECF No. 256) and all other Defendants are excused from participation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 13, 2020. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 13, 2020 Filing 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re #253 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jan C. Hutwelker filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Fedder, David)
October 12, 2020 Filing 257 RESPONSE in Opposition re #250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Catherine Aimone-Martin filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
October 12, 2020 Filing 256 MOTION for Order to Remove Confidentiality Designation of Documents Produced by Plaintiff in Discovery by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Columbia's Responses to SSI Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Atty Zidar and Atty Fedder emails, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Hutwelker Transcript, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Panza, Richard)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying #251 Motion to File Document Under Seal ; denying #252 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 7, 2020. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 6, 2020 Filing 254 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. re #253 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jan C. Hutwelker Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Jan Hutwelker, #2 Exhibit A - Hutwelker Report, #3 Exhibit B - Hutwelker References, #4 Exhibit C - Right of Way Procedure, #5 Exhibit D - Mineral Industry Surveys) (Panza, Richard)
October 6, 2020 Filing 253 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jan C. Hutwelker by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ron Lewis Revised Independent Expert Valuation, #2 Exhibit B - CGT's EarthRes Valuation Report, #3 Exhibit C - Rebuttal Report of EarthRes, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Jan Hutwelker, #5 Exhibit E - Right of Way Procedure, #6 Exhibit F - USPAP No. 2 U-71 2014-15 Edition) (Panza, Richard)
October 6, 2020 Filing 252 MOTION to File Document Under Seal Exhibit E to Defendant's Motion in Limine by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Exhibit E Under Seal) (Panza, Richard)
October 6, 2020 Filing 251 MOTION to File Document Under Seal Exhibit C to the Deposition Transcript of Jan C. Hutwelker by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Exhibit C Under Seal) (Panza, Richard)
October 5, 2020 Filing 250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Catherine Aimone-Martin by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Catherine Aimone-Martin Report) (Zidar, Rachelle)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER OF COMMISSION CHAIR SETTING RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER OF COMMISSION CHAIR SETTING RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER OF COMMISSION CHAIR SETTING RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Columbia Gas to compensate the Commissioners at the amount reflected in the Summary Invoice attached hereto within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/28/2020. (Attachment: #1 Attachment 1) (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Order of Commission Chair Vacating the Hearing before the Rule 71.1 Committee. (jk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 243 NOTICE of Change of Address by Craig Beaton Paynter (Paynter, Craig)
February 4, 2020 Filing 242 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order of Commission Chair Regarding Status Update on all Defendants. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Order of Commission Chair Regarding Request to Reopen Discovery and Hearing Date. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 16, 2020 Filing 239 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Filing Commission Hearing Transcript Regarding B&N Coal, Inc. Property (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript) (Smith, Adam)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order of Commissioner Chair Regarding Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. 231 and 232) (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 237 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Notice of Filing Deposition Transcripts and Exhibits of Samuel D. Koon and Carl Baker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 2) (Fedder, David)
November 14, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE by Defendant B & N Coal, Inc. : Witness List, Exhibit List, and Expert Qualifications for Hearing Before the Commission November 21-22, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - S. Koon Qualifications) (Gurbst, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC of Emergence From Bankruptcy (Sullivan, Brian)
November 14, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Plaintiff's Witness List and Exhibit List for the November 21-22, 2019 Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summary of Hinkle Qualifications) (Fedder, David)
November 7, 2019 Filing 233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #231 MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Profferred Expert Samuel D. Koon, #232 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Valuation Testimony of Profferred Lay Witness Carl Baker, Jr. filed by Defendant B & N Coal, Inc.. (Gurbst, Richard)
October 31, 2019 Filing 232 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Valuation Testimony of Profferred Lay Witness Carl Baker, Jr. by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine #2, #2 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Valuation Parcels and Defendants, #3 Exhibit 2 - Carl Baker Jr. Deposition, 10/24/2018 with depo Exhs 1-3) (Fedder, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 231 MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Profferred Expert Samuel D. Koon by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine #1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Valuation Parcels and Defendants, #3 Exhibit 2 - Carl Baker Jr. Deposition, 10/24/2018, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 1 - Samuel Koon Deposition, 9/4/2018 with depo Exhs 6 and 8, #5 Exhibit 3, Part 2 - Samuel Koon Deposition Exh 9) (Fedder, David)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Order of Commission Chair Regarding Requests for Pretrial Conferences and Hearing Dates. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 229 Standing Order of Commission Chair on Practice and Procedure Before the Rule 71.1 Commission. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor M. Hagan for Defendant B & N Coal, Inc. (Hagan, Eleanor)
September 23, 2019 Filing 227 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 02/21/2017, before Judge Michael H. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lahana DuFour, Telephone number 614-719-3286. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 10/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2019. (DuFour, Lahana)
August 23, 2019 Filing 226 Response re #225 MOTION for Hearing Motion for Pretrial Conference : Response in Support of Motion for Pretrial Conference by Defendant B & N Coal, Inc.. (Gurbst, Richard)
August 20, 2019 Filing 225 MOTION for Hearing Motion for Pretrial Conference by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Truax, Philip)
August 20, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Malorie A. Alverson substituting for Amanda A. Barreto as to Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Alverson, Malorie)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER - The Court STAYS all proceedings against Blackhawk until the Bankruptcy Court grants relief from the stay or otherwise dismisses Blackhawk's petition. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/15/19. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER ON OBJECTIONS AND FINAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COMMISSIONERS. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/15/19. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC of Suggestion on Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Sullivan, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 220 Response re #219 MOTION OBJECTIONS TO THE COURTS PROPOSED INSTRUCTIONS TO COMMISSIONERS Columbia's Responses to Blackhawk's Objections to the Court's Proposed Instructions to Commissioners by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 219 MOTION OBJECTIONS TO THE COURTS PROPOSED INSTRUCTIONS TO COMMISSIONERS by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Sullivan, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 218 Proposed Instructions to Commissioners. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 6/6/2019. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 217 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Notice of Dismissal of Certain Defendants (Fedder, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 216 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant, Oxford Mining Company, LLC, a third-party interest holder in the instant Action relative to Tract No. 63 (OH-PE-122.000) be dismissed, without prejudice, by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 215 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Fedder, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE by Defendants Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, Sergeant Stone, Inc. re #212 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Joint Proposed Instructions to The Commission (Panza, Richard)
January 4, 2019 Filing 213 NOTICE by Defendant B & N Coal, Inc. re #212 Order on Motion for Leave to File, : Proposed Instructions to Commissioners (Gurbst, Richard)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 OPINION and ORDER appointing the commission and denying #211 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Proposed instructions for the Commissioners due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/11/18. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified text on 12/31/2018 (ew).
November 28, 2018 Filing 211 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Joint Objection to Commissioner, Instanter by Defendants Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief in Support of Objection to Commissioner of Defendants' Sergeant Stone, Inc. and Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC) (Panza, Richard)
November 21, 2018 Filing 210 Response re #209 Objection (non motion), Response to Defendants' Joint Objection to Commissioner by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Fedder, David)
November 21, 2018 Filing 209 Objection of Defendants Sergeant Stone, Inc. and Blackhawk Land And Resources, LLC's to Commissioner by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of Transcript of Examination Hearing Proceedings) (Truax, Philip)
November 19, 2018 Filing 208 Transcript of Examination Hearing Proceedings held on 11/7/2018, before Judge Michael H. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lahana DuFour, Telephone number 614-719-3286. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 12/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2019. (DuFour, Lahana)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 11/14/18. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE by Defendant Oxford Mining Company, LLC of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition) (Marinucci, Dante)
November 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Examination Hearing held on 11/7/2018. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER - To accommodate Columbia and Blackhawk in scheduling these depositions, the deadline for completing DISCOVERY as between Columbia and Blackhawk only is hereby extended to OCTOBER 19, 2018. The Court notes that the deadline for all other discovery in the case expired on September 21, 2018. #190 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 3, 2018. (jlk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE of Hearing - Examination Hearing set for 11/7/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 9/27/2018. (sln)
September 20, 2018 Filing 202 Response re #199 Order : Response regarding Commissioner by Defendant B & N Coal, Inc.. (Gurbst, Richard)
September 19, 2018 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 9/19/2018. Columbia Gas and Blackhawk to submit letter briefing on discovery issues by 9/21/2018. Court will reconvene after review. (sln)
September 19, 2018 Filing 201 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Defendants Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Sullivan, Brian)
September 18, 2018 Filing 200 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER regarding appointment of commission signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/30/18. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE by Defendant Oxford Mining Company, LLC of Withdrawal and Substitution of Trial Attorney (Montgomery, Michael)
August 22, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Dante A. Marinucci for Defendant Oxford Mining Company, LLC (Marinucci, Dante)
August 21, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. of Service (Truax, Philip)
August 14, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Billiter Cameron for Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC (Cameron, Sarah)
July 30, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Terry W. Schmidt by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Sullivan, Brian)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 OPINION and ORDER granting #176 Columbia's Motion to Appoint a Commission. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/26/18. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 2, 2018 Filing 192 NOTICE by Defendant B & N Coal, Inc. 's Rule 26(A)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures to Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmissions, LLC (Gurbst, Richard)
June 29, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. of Service of Preliminary Expert Reports (Truax, Philip)
June 15, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Primary Expert due by 6/29/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/24/2018. Discovery due by 9/21/2018. (sln)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Granting #189 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/15/2018. (Copies mailed to parties who did not receive electronic notice.) (sln)
June 14, 2018 Filing 189 Joint MOTION for Order to Modify Scheduling Order by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Truax, Philip)
April 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Primary Expert due by 6/15/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/10/2018. (sln)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting #187 Dfts' Motion Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/16/2018. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 16, 2018 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION Modify Scheduling Order by Defendants B & N Coal, Inc., Shelly and Sands, Inc., Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, Oxford Mining Company, LLC, Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Montgomery, Michael)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/8/2018. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 8, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Primary Expert due by 5/1/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/1/2018. (sln)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Granting #183 Motion Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/8/2018. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 8, 2018 Filing 184 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order) (Fedder, David)
March 8, 2018 Filing 183 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Fedder, David)
February 6, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. of Service (Panza, Richard)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Leave to File. Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Commission (ECF No. 176) is deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 1, 2018. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 31, 2018 Filing 180 Unopposed MOTION to File Opposition Out of Time by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Sullivan, Brian) Modified text and event type on 2/1/2018 (ew).
January 31, 2018 Filing 179 REPLY to Response to Motion re #176 MOTION Motion for Appointment of Commission filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
January 18, 2018 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #176 MOTION Motion for Appointment of Commission filed by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Sullivan, Brian)
January 17, 2018 Filing 177 RESPONSE to Motion re #176 MOTION Motion for Appointment of Commission filed by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Panza, Richard)
December 27, 2017 Filing 176 MOTION Motion for Appointment of Commission by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Fedder, David)
December 5, 2017 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Certificate of Service of Discovery (Haug, John)
November 28, 2017 Filing 174 STATUS REPORT Regarding Dismissal of Third-Party Interest Holders by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
November 28, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
November 27, 2017 Set Deadlines pursuant to #172 : Jon Eichelberger answer due 12/11/2017. (ew)
November 27, 2017 Filing 172 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on Jon Eichelberger Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
November 27, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 11/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on Novmeber 20, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 14, 2017 Filing 169 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION as to Jon Eichelberger. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 14, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Supplemental Notice of Condemnation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-47) (Haug, John)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Granting [156} Motion to Substitute Party. Primary Expert due by 3/16/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/18/2018. Discovery due by 9/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on October 30, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 30, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/30/2017. (NMK)
October 30, 2017 Filing 166 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on Jon Eichelberger Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
October 26, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #162 Order,, Set Deadlines, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Chart) (Haug, John)
October 26, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
October 26, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file an updated chart summarizing the litigation status relative to the remaining landowners and third-party interest holders by 10/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/23/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 12, 2017 Filing 161 RULE 26(f) REPORT Jointly Filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
October 4, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
September 29, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
September 12, 2017 Filing 158 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #156 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Rule 71.1(g) Notice of Hearing (Fedder, David)
September 12, 2017 Filing 157 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #156 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Rule 71.1(g) filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Quitclaim Deed) (Fedder, David)
September 12, 2017 Filing 156 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Rule 71.1(g) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Fedder, David)
September 6, 2017 Filing 155 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint filed by Oxford Mining Company, LLC. (ew)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Leave to File Answer Instanter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/6/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 5, 2017 Filing 153 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Oxford Mining Company, LLC. identifying corporate parent Westmoreland Resources Partners. (Montgomery, Michael) Modified text on 9/6/2017 (ew).
September 5, 2017 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Instanter an Answer by Defendant Oxford Mining Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer) (Montgomery, Michael)
August 30, 2017 Filing 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #150 Notice of Hearing (Fedder, David)
August 24, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2017 01:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER - The Court conducted a status conference on August 22, 2017. Columbia Gas represented that it is in settlement discussions with multiple Defendants. Any party that believes the Court can assist in settlement negotiations shall contact the Undersigned. A preliminary pretrial conference will be set in Mid-October, 2017 providing sufficient time to conduct the meeting of the parties re 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 23, 2017. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 22, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 8/22/2017. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (sln)
August 21, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Montgomery for Defendant Oxford Mining Company, LLC (Montgomery, Michael)
August 16, 2017 Filing 147 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #133 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLCS Motion For A Pre-Rule 16 Status Conference submitted per 7-12-17 Order of the Court #142 filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart - Fee Owners and Third Party Interests) (Haug, John)
August 11, 2017 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Shelly and Sands, Inc. re #145 Notice of Appearance (Jones, Travis)
August 9, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Morgan Jones for Defendant Shelly and Sands, Inc. (Jones, Travis)
July 21, 2017 Filing 144 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Texas Eastern Transmission, LP by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
July 19, 2017 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #142 Order on Motion for Hearing, Pre-Rule 16 Status Conference (Haug, John)
July 12, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Updated Chart Summarizing the Litigation Status due by 8/16/2017. Set/Reset Hearings:( Status Conference set for 8/22/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sem)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #133 Plaintiff's Pre-Rule 16 Status Conference; Status Conference is scheduled for 8/22/17 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom # 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/12/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 10, 2017 Filing 141 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint, filed by Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Sullivan, Brian)
June 26, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle Kuznicki Zidar for Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. (Zidar, Rachelle)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the amended complaint; Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC answer due 7/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/19/2017. (kdp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 19, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #125 Stipulation, #113 Amended Complaint, New date requested 7/10/2017. (to Respond to Amended Complaint), MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/10/2017. ( Responses due by 7/13/2017) by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Brian)
June 7, 2017 Filing 137 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. re #134 Order, Combined Amended Notice of Withdrawal And Amended Notice of Substitution of Trial Attorney for Sergeant Stone, Inc. (Panza, Richard)
June 5, 2017 Filing 136 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #133 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLCS Motion For A Pre-Rule 16 Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fee Owners/Third-Party Interest Chart) (Haug, John)
June 5, 2017 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLCS Motion For A Pre-Rule 16 Status Conference filed by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Panza, Richard)
June 2, 2017 Filing 134 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re #132 Notice of Withdrawal of Andrew J. Natale, Mark L. Rodio and Allison Taller Reich as Defendant's Counsel, #130 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Counsel are DIRECTED to re-file their Notice in compliance with Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/2/2017. (ew)
May 31, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLCS Motion For A Pre-Rule 16 Status Conference by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Haug, John)
May 30, 2017 Filing 132 NOTICE by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. of Withdrawal of Andrew J. Natale, Mark L. Rodio and Allison Taller Reich as Defendant's Counsel (Reich, Allison)
May 30, 2017 Filing 131 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint, (Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon) filed by Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Panza, Richard)
May 30, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Richard D Panza substituting for Allison Taller Reich as to Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Panza, Richard)
May 25, 2017 Filing 129 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC and Chesapeake Exploration, LLC by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
May 24, 2017 Filing 128 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Of Dismissal Of Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
May 22, 2017 Filing 127 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint, filed by Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy)
May 18, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Dismissal of Eclipse Resources - Ohio, LLC and Eclipse Resources I, LP (Haug, John)
May 17, 2017 Reset Deadlines: Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC answer due 6/19/2017. (ew)
May 17, 2017 Filing 125 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Sullivan, Brian)
May 12, 2017 Filing 124 Clerk's Supplemental Notice of Condemnation as to Oxford Mining Company, LLC pursuant to Rule 71.1 re #1 Complaint. (ew)
May 11, 2017 Reset Deadlines: Gulfport Energy Corporation answer due 7/24/2017; Texas Eastern Transmission LP answer due 7/24/2017. (ew)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTATION ORDER granting #120 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Defendants Gulfport Energy Corporation and Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. Answer now due July 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/11/17. (NMK)
May 11, 2017 Filing 122 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint, filed by Shelly and Sands, Inc.. (Jones, Travis)
May 11, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE by Defendant Texas Eastern Transmission LP re #120 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/24/2017. (Herrnstein, Kara)
May 11, 2017 Filing 120 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer (New date requested 7/24/2017) by Defendants Gulfport Energy Corporation Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Herrnstein, Kara) Modified docket text and event type on 5/12/2017 (ew).
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: Doc #118 Order striking #113 Amended Complaint filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/10/2017. (kdp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER striking #113 Amended Complaint filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/9/2017. (kdp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 9, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Notice Of Dismissal Of Certain Defendants (Haug, John)
May 9, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Notice Of Dismissal Of Certain Defendants (Haug, John)
May 9, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #113 Amended Complaint, Memorandum to Clerk (Haug, John)
May 9, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Supplemental Notice Of Condemnation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B63) (Haug, John)
May 9, 2017 Filing 113 AMENDED COMPLAINT in Condemnation against All Defendants, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1-B29, #3 Exhibit B30-B40, #4 Exhibit B41 - B55, #5 Exhibit B56 - B68, #6 Exhibit B69 - B73) (Haug, John) Modified text to vacate stricken per order on 5/10/2017 (kdp).
April 28, 2017 Filing 112 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #96 OPINION AND ORDER served on Jon Howard Eichelberger. (ew)
April 25, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Memorandum to Clerk (Haug, John)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting #109 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Gulfport Energy Corporation answer due 5/13/2017; Texas Eastern Transmission LP answer due 5/13/2017. (sln)
April 11, 2017 Filing 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation. New date requested 5/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion of Defendants Gulfport Energy Corporation's and Texas Eastern Transmission LP to Extend Answer Deadline) (Herrnstein, Kara) Modified docket text and removed association with Doc. 2 on 4/12/2017 (ew).
April 5, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Notice Of Dismissal Of Certain Defendants (Haug, John)
March 31, 2017 Filing 107 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Vivian Dillion, Pamela Ensinger. (ew)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Substitution filed by Defendants Vivian Dillion and Pam Ensinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/22/2017. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 21, 2017 Filing 105 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movants Vivian Dillon, Pamela Ensinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (ew)
March 16, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Jesko for Defendant Eclipse Resources - Ohio, LLC (Jesko, Anthony)
March 15, 2017 Filing 103 STIPULATION Stipulated Dismissal Entry Between Plaintiff and Defendant The East Ohio Gas Company by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Gulfport Energy Corporation answer due 4/13/2017; Texas Eastern Transmission LP answer due 4/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/14/2017. (sln)
March 13, 2017 Filing 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, New date requested 4/13/2017. by Defendant Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Herrnstein, Kara)
March 10, 2017 Filing 100 Surety Bond for Preliminary Injunction in the amount of $ $427,874.10 posted. (sem)
March 9, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Dismissal of Certain Defendants (Smith, Adam)
March 9, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Pay-In Memorandum (Smith, Adam)
March 9, 2017 Cash BOND in the amount of $ 42,477.00 posted by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (ew)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - Clerk is DIRECTED to return documents submitted for filing along with a copy of this Order to the non-parties. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/9/17. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION AND ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Condemnation Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Immediate Access to and Use of Easements. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/3/2017. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER finding as moot #55 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/1/17. (jk)
February 28, 2017 Filing 94 Response re #84 Notice (Other) (Plaintiff's Memorandum to Clerk) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Haug, John)
February 28, 2017 Filing 93 Response re #66 Order, Set Hearings Plaintiff's Memorandum Regarding Updated Acquisition Status by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Haug, John)
February 27, 2017 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Supplemental Certificate of Proof of Service by Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Publication Affidavit - Noble County, #2 Exhibit B Publication Affidavit - Perry County, #3 Exhibit C Publication Affidavit - Vinton County) (Snyder, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
February 27, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Scott Sullivan for Defendant Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC (Sullivan, Brian)
February 24, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
February 24, 2017 Filing 88 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #17 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND CONDEMNATION ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Memorandum Regarding Service Status as it Relates to Jeri Barron filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 24, 2017 Filing 87 1st Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Exhibits filed by Middlefield Banking Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Ridge, John)
February 23, 2017 Filing 86 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Middlefield Banking Company. (Ridge, John)
February 23, 2017 Filing 85 EXHIBITS from Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/21/17 before Judge Michael H. Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4) (jk)
February 22, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #83 Status Conference Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Haug, John)
February 21, 2017 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/21/2017. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (ds)
February 20, 2017 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and Defendant B & N Coal, Inc. by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam)
February 20, 2017 Filing 81 STIPULATION of Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and Defendant Shelly and Sands, Inc. by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Smith, Adam)
February 20, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Dismissal of Certain Defendants (Smith, Adam)
February 17, 2017 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC Certificate of Proof of Service by Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Publication Affidavit - Hocking County, #2 Exhibit B - Publication Affidavit - Monroe County, #3 Exhibit C - Publication Affidavit - Muskingum County, #4 Exhibit D - Publication Affidavit - Noble County, #5 Exhibit E - Publication Affidavit - Perry County) (Snyder, Michael)
February 17, 2017 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Connie Coleman on 02/10/17, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 17, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Haug, John)
February 16, 2017 Filing 76 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by David Patrick Dalton. (Kuhl, John)
February 15, 2017 Filing 75 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Jeffrey A Paczewski. (Strayer, Matthew)
February 15, 2017 Filing 74 Response re #66 Order, Set Hearings Memorandum Regarding Acquisition Status by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Remaining Land Owners, #2 Exhibit B - Remaining Third Party Interests) (Haug, John)
February 15, 2017 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Strike #17 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND CONDEMNATION ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 15, 2017 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ohio Power Company, American Electric Power Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Electric Power Company, Inc. for Ohio Power Company.. (Grayem, Jeremy)
February 15, 2017 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, of Defendant Ohio Power Company filed by Ohio Power Company. (Grayem, Jeremy)
February 14, 2017 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Joseph Lee David Smith, David L Smith, Melissa L Smith. (Strayer, Matthew)
February 14, 2017 Filing 69 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Reich, Allison)
February 14, 2017 Filing 68 Letter from CT Corporation addressed to Branden P. Moore (ew)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Gulfport Energy Corporation answer due 3/13/2017; Texas Eastern Transmission LP answer due 3/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/14/2017. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/21/2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/14/17. (jk)
February 13, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons New date requested 3/13/2017. by Defendants Gulfport Energy Corporation, Texas Eastern Transmission LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Herrnstein, Kara)
February 13, 2017 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Eclipse Resources I LP on 2/10/17, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Farm Credit Services of Mid-America FLCA on 2/8/17, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Citizens National Bank of Woodsfield on 2/6/17, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Bill Barron on 02/10/17, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara H Herrnstein for Defendant Texas Eastern Transmission LP (Herrnstein, Kara)
February 13, 2017 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Shelly and Sands, Inc.. (Jones, Travis)
February 13, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Status Conference held on 2/13/2017. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
February 13, 2017 Filing 58 DEFENDANT TRI-STATE RECLAMATION ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Tri-State Reclamation, Ltd.. (Snider, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc.. (Reich, Allison)
February 13, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Taller Reich for Defendant Sergeant Stone, Inc. (Reich, Allison)
February 13, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION to Strike #17 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND CONDEMNATION ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Defendants David Patrick Dalton, Laura M Dalton. (Kuhl, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 54 DEFENDANT MARK J. HOWDYSHELL, TRUSTEE OF TRUST #300 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Mark J Howdyshell. (Snider, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 53 DEFENDANT DAVID SCOTT OWEN'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by David Scott Owen. (Snider, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 52 Defendants, Charles W. Owen, Jr. and Kathryn E. Owen, ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Kathryn E Owen, Charles W Owen, Jr.. (Snider, John)
February 10, 2017 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Haug, John)
February 10, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghna M. Rao for Defendant B & N Coal, Inc. (Rao, Meghna)
February 9, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara H Herrnstein for Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation (Herrnstein, Kara)
February 8, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Compliance with Loc.R. 65.1(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Preliminary Conference) (Smith, Adam)
February 8, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Snider for Defendants Mark J Howdyshell, David Scott Owen, Kathryn E Owen, Charles W Owen, Jr., Tri-State Reclamation, Ltd. (Snider, John)
February 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 2/7/2017. (sln)
February 7, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC of Dismissal of Certain Defendants (Smith, Adam)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - Preliminary Conference set for 2/13/2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/7/17. (jk)
February 7, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Strayer for Defendants Louis Herod Bedford, Joseph Lee David Smith, Paul E Dietrich, Sandra A Dietrich, Five Starr Farms, LLC, Melzia Lee Flowers, Barbara J Hutchins, Martin A Hutchins, Vernon L. Kirkbride, Raymond J. North, III, Thomas R Persinger, Diane L Persinger, Donna Jean Pittman Bedford, David L Smith, Melissa L Smith, Melvin D Tucker (Strayer, Matthew)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Branden P Moore; Brooks H. Spears; J. Brian Jackson and Christina M. Lepore terminated; granting #40 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John R. Haug is designated as Trial Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/7/2017. (agm)
February 6, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Gibson for Defendant Texas Eastern Transmission LP (Gibson, Daniel)
February 6, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M Grayem for Defendant Ohio Power Company (Grayem, Jeremy)
February 3, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney J. Brian Jackson, Branden P. Moore, Brooks H. Spears, and Christina M. Lepore, MOTION to Substitute Attorney John R. Haug as Trial Counsel ( Responses due by 2/24/2017) by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacy Williams, #2 Declaration of John R. Haug) (Smith, Adam)
January 31, 2017 Filing 39 Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Vinton County, Ohio issued by the Clerk pursuant to Rule 71.1. (sem)
January 31, 2017 Filing 38 Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Perry County, Ohio issued by the Clerk pursuant to Rule 71.1. (sem)
January 31, 2017 Filing 37 Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Noble County, Ohio issued by the Clerk pursuant to Rule 71.1. (sem)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Counsel for Columbia Gas is ORDERED to stop telephoning the Undersigned's chambers and asking for a formal hearing date (or for asking for information about the Undersigned's criminal cases). Counsel for Columbia Gas is again ADVISED that the Court will set a formal hearing date after the parties meet with the Magistrate Judge on 2/7/2017. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/31/2017. (er)
January 31, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC re #19 Notice (Other) Supplemental Rule 71(d)(3)(B)(i) Certificate for Service by Publication (Moore, Branden)
January 31, 2017 Filing 34 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Supplemental Notice of Publication - Vinton County, Ohio (Moore, Branden)
January 31, 2017 Filing 33 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Supplemental Notice of Publication - Perry County, Ohio (Moore, Branden)
January 31, 2017 Filing 32 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Supplemental Notice of Publication - Noble County, Ohio (Moore, Branden)
January 30, 2017 Filing 31 Letter from CT Corporation Systems re: Farm Credit Services of Mid-America, FLCA. (mas)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Plt's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Brian Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/27/2017. (sln)
January 26, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5814135) of J. Brian Jackson by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Moore, Branden)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Brian Jackson ; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brooks H. Spears; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christina M. Lepore; granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John R. Haug; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David M. Fedder; granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah E.S. Carlson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/24/2017. (mas)
January 24, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/7/2017 02:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
January 24, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome W Cook for Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Cook, Jerome)
January 24, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Snyder for Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Snyder, Michael)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/23/17. Judge Michael H. Watson was randomly reassigned by the Clerk. (sem)
January 23, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5809787) of Sarah E.S. Carlson by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Adam)
January 23, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5809786) of David M. Fedder by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Adam)
January 23, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5809785) of John R. Haug by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Adam)
January 23, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C Smith for Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Smith, Adam)
January 23, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC RULE 71.1(d)(3)(B)(i) CERTIFICATE FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 18 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #17 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND CONDEMNATION ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Elaine Coppedge) (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 17 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND CONDEMNATION ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Perry County, Ohio pursuant to Rule 71.1 re #1 Complaint. (sem)
January 23, 2017 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Noble County, Ohio pursuant to Rule 71.1 re #1 Complaint. (sem)
January 23, 2017 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Muskingum County, Ohio pursuant to the Rule 71.1 re #1 Complaint. (sem)
January 23, 2017 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Monroe County, Ohio pursuant to Rule 71.1 re #1 Complaint. (sem)
January 23, 2017 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Condemnation for Publication in Hocking County, Ohio issued pursuant to Rule 71.1 re #1 Complaint. (sem)
January 23, 2017 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Condemnation issued pursuant to Rule 71.1 re #1 Complaint. (sem)
January 23, 2017 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5809127) of Christina M. Lepore by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5809117) of Brooks H. Spears by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5809100) of J. Brian Jackson by Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Notice of Publication - Perry County (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Notice of Publication - Noble County (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Notice of Publication - Muskingum County (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Notice of Publication - Monroe County (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Notice of Publication - Hocking County (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Ohio Rule 71.1 Notice (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Condemnation against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5809030), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Leach Corporate Disclosure) (Moore, Branden) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2017: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B1- B29, #4 Exhibit B30 - B40, #5 Exhibit B41 - B55, #6 Exhibit B56 - B68, #7 Exhibit B69 - B73). Modified on 1/23/2017 to add exhibits (jcw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2017: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (sem).
January 23, 2017 Party Michael D Bennett, Robert E Bennett, Verna E Forst, Richard Hinkle, Willard Hinkle, Peter R Kiener, William C Kiener, Susan Kiener Murray, Mary J. Storts Goddard heirs, Paul Smith, Snyder and Swanson, Inc., Sunnyhill Coal Sales Company, Robert G Tague, The Ohio Fuel Supply Company and T.E. Truex added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party John F Bentz, Heirs of Cyrus Truxall, Heirs of Deborah Truex, Heirs of Elizabeth Timerlake, Heirs of Elma A. McPeek, Heirs of Elma Rosella Adaline Justice, Heirs of George Rice, Heirs of Guy P. Shepperd, Heirs of Harvey M. Berkley, Heirs of Howard Shepperd, Heirs of James Appleman, Heirs of John Shepperd, Heirs of Kenneth Paul Holcomb, Heirs of Leona Appleman, Heirs of Marcella D. Allen, Heirs of Marian L. Stockdale, Heirs of Marjorie L. Bierie, Heirs of Mary Appleman, Heirs of Mary Appleman Fletcher, Heirs of Nelda Maxine Amidon, Heirs of Noreen Luebben Henderon, Heirs of R.J. McGonagle, Heirs of W.P. Beaver, Joseph L Kiener, Karl Thompson and John Truex added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party Harold R Aspery, John Bennett, H. William Boltres, David A. Waldron & Associates, Inc., Guernsey Petroleum Corporation, Heirs and Assigns of Bessie M. Phillips, Heirs and Assigns of Catherine I. Daugherty, Heirs and Assigns of Edna F. Jones, Heirs and Assigns of Ernestine L. Lowrey, Heirs and Assigns of Ethel Phillips, Heirs and Assigns of Georgia C. Calhoun, Heirs and Assigns of Gladys E. Hoover Bartimus, Heirs and Assigns of John Cook, Heirs and Assigns of Rolland D. Barringer, Heirs and Assigns of Ruth A. Welsh, Heirs and assigns of Cletus Appleman, Heirs of Benjamin Stackhouse, Heirs of Bertha M. Barringer, Heirs of Mary M. Daugherty, David P Tague, Dorothy Tague Racher and David A Waldron added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party Jeri Barron, George Bennett, Mary Evelyn Bennett, James T Bentz, Bluegrass Pipeline Company, LLC, Monica Brothers, Beverly DeCoster, Melzia Lee Flowers, Patricia Ann Griego, Gary L Harvey, Mary Helmers, Dorothy Hupman, Mary Ann McGreevy, Freda M Rigby, Daisy Smith and Russel Stickney added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Consol Mining Company, Switzer Water Association, Texas Eastern Transmission LP, County of Monroe, Ohio, CNX Gas Company, LLC, United Telephone Company of Ohio, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Pennzoil-Quaker State Company, Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC, Middlefield Banking Company, Laura M Dalton, Ohio Power Company, Fairfield Federal Savings and Loan Association of Lancaster, Union Savings Bank, Solid Rock Energy, Inc., Jackson County Water Company, Paul E Dietrich, Sergeant Stone, Inc., Katherine Anderson, Dorothy E Kidney, Pin Oak Energy Partners, LLC and Barbara I Anderson added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party William Joseph Hillis, The Golden Rule Oil and Gas Company, John D Mahon, Donna B Mahon, Bonna J Sims, County of Perry, Ohio, Barbara Hinkle, Carrie Parker, Leona Landerman, Michelle Kiener Brooks, Robert Hinkle, Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, The Peoples National Bank, CNX Marine Terminals, Inc, Carrizo (Utica) LLC, CNX RCPC, LLC, Chesapeake Exploration, LLC, Hess Ohio Developments, LLC, Don Michael Tucker, Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative, Inc., County of Muskingum, Ohio, Kingston Oil Corporation, Kathryn Chester, G-R Contracting, Inc., Farm Credit Services of Mid-America, FLCA, Citizens National Bank of Woodsfield and The East Ohio Gas Company added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party Stacy Craig, HCR Holdings, LLC, Charles R Bennett, Erik Bennett, James A Bennett, Margaret E Davies, Pamela Sidewell, Patrick W Allen, Temple Oil and Gas Company, The Sunday Creek Coal Company, Elise Rorrer, Helen J Appleman, Mary C Appleman Chapman, Olds Investments, LLC, Patty A Smith, Robert E Appleman and The Cabin, LLC added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party David Scott Owen, Mark J Howdyshell, David L Smith, Melissa L Smith, Joseph Lee David Smith, David Craig, Deborah Day, Connie Coleman, Bill Barron, Terry Barron, Roberta Jane Hubbell, Ulysses Grant Coleman, Eclipse Resources - Ohio, LLC, James Day, Jeanie Enterprises, LLC and Rosemary Tague Mackin added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party Jeffrey A Paczewski, Gary A Rubel, Nancy S Rubel, Five Starr Farms, LLC, Donald M Kirkbride, Linda M Kirkbride, Vernon L. Kirkbride, Steve Kramer, Melvin D Tucker, Martin A Hutchins, Barbara J Hutchins, Charles W Owen, Jr., Kathryn E Owen, Heritage Coal Company, LLC, Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC and Tri-State Reclamation, Ltd. added. (Moore, Branden)
January 23, 2017 Party D&D Property Two, LLC, Mary T Wolf, Shelly and Sands, Inc., Sandra A Dietrich, Daniel P Dick, Carrie M Dick, Michael E Aberegg, Sr., Deborah Aberegg, Louis Herod Bedford, Donna Jean Pittman Bedford and Koehler Knob Dairy Farm, LLC added. (Moore, Branden)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. 171.54 Acres of land, more or less, in Fairfield, Hocking, Monroe, Morgan, Muskingum, Noble, Perry, and Vinton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 171.54 Acres of land, more or less, in Fairfield, Hocking, Monroe, Morgan, Muskingum, Noble, Perry, and Vinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Marcella D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Rolland D. Barringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Muskingum, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M Kirkbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna B Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Guy P. Shepperd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M Kirkbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Deborah Truex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Raymond J. North, III
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of James Appleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Michael Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy E Kidney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C Kiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Cyrus Truxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Golden Rule Oil and Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary A Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cabin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNX Marine Terminals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&D Property Two, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verna E Forst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L Kiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Ensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Services of Mid-America, FLCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Mary Appleman Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Fuel Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegrass Pipeline Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann McGreevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Elma A. McPeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise Rorrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Evelyn Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNX Gas Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrizo (Utica) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Eastern Transmission LP
Represented By: Matthew Wesley Warnock
Represented By: Kara H Herrnstein
Represented By: Frank Leslie Merrill
Represented By: Daniel C Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Power Company
Represented By: Jeremy M Grayem
Represented By: Marilyn McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa L Smith
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: Clinton Patrick Stahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick W Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennzoil-Quaker State Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Bertha M. Barringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Mining Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Montgomery
Represented By: Dante A. Marinucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Tague Racher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G Tague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Georgia C. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder and Swanson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen J Appleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guernsey Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kay Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & N Coal, Inc.
Represented By: Meghna M. Rao
Represented By: Eleanor M. Hagan
Represented By: Michael J Montgomery
Represented By: Richard S Gurbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Gladys E. Hoover Bartimus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Switzer Water Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane L Persinger
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koehler Knob Dairy Farm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Perry, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Bessie M. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonna J Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Jane Hubbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pin Oak Energy Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Leona Appleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin A Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consol Mining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R Persinger
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Ruth A. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Resources - Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Anthony W. Jesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary T Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leona Landerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W Owen, Jr.
Represented By: John Michael Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter R Kiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temple Oil and Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Kenneth Paul Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Kiener Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olds Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Mary Appleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanie Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Nelda Maxine Amidon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Billiter Cameron
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Represented By: Michael J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Joseph Hillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Smith
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: Clinton Patrick Stahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Peoples National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melzia Lee Flowers
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Federal Savings and Loan Association of Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy S Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Sidewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Rock Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ann Griego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly and Sands, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Morgan Jones
Represented By: Michael J Montgomery
Represented By: Stephen Robert McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Monroe, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Eichelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Mary M. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The East Ohio Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Elma Rosella Adaline Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of John Shepperd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Coal Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E Owen
Represented By: John Michael Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Vernon L. Kirkbride
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Catherine I. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Appleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Herod Bedford
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.E. Truex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E Dietrich
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Telephone Company of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Noreen Luebben Henderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Aberegg, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura M Dalton
Represented By: Thomas Howard Fusonie
Represented By: Daniel E Shuey
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Represented By: Joseph R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freda M Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret E Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Paczewski
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: Clinton Patrick Stahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Starr Farms, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Scott Owen
Represented By: John Michael Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and assigns of Cletus Appleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Patrick Dalton
Represented By: Thomas Howard Fusonie
Represented By: Christopher Logan Ingram
Represented By: Daniel E Shuey
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Represented By: Joseph R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens National Bank of Woodsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Howard Shepperd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Tague Mackin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Mark J Howdyshell
Represented By: John Michael Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sunday Creek Coal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C Appleman Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Jean Pittman Bedford
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of John Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary J. Storts Goddard heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Elizabeth Timerlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulysses Grant Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Hupman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Ethel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lee David Smith
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Represented By: Michael Braunstein
Represented By: Clinton Patrick Stahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Wesley Warnock
Represented By: Kara H Herrnstein
Represented By: Frank Leslie Merrill
Represented By: Daniel C Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie M Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Harvey M. Berkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of W.P. Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Aberegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G-R Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Resources I, LP
Represented By: Anthony W. Jesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of George Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold R Aspery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Marian L. Stockdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Waldron & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kiener Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middlefield Banking Company
Represented By: Brett R Sheraw
Represented By: John Charles Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Edna F. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. William Boltres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra A Dietrich
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Helmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNX RCPC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P Tague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Ohio Developments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin D Tucker
Represented By: Matthew L. Strayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Stone, Inc.
Represented By: Malorie A. Alverson
Represented By: Mark L Rodio
Represented By: Allison Taller Reich
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Natale
Represented By: Richard D Panza
Represented By: Philip J. Truax
Represented By: Rachelle Kuznicki Zidar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Marjorie L. Bierie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russel Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Ernestine L. Lowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Reclamation, Ltd.
Represented By: John Michael Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of Benjamin Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyhill Coal Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Truex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs of R.J. McGonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara I Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly DeCoster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Sarah E.S. Carlson
Represented By: Adam C Smith
Represented By: Michael L Snyder
Represented By: David M. Fedder
Represented By: Christina M. Lepore
Represented By: Brooks H. Spears
Represented By: Jerome W. Cook
Represented By: John R. Haug
Represented By: Branden P Moore
Represented By: J. Brian Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Craig Paynter
Represented By: Craig Beaton Paynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Keith W Schneider
Represented By: Keith W Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shawn Judge
Represented By: Shawn Kincade Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?