Boddie v. Prisley
Plaintiff: Howard Boddie, Jr.
Defendant: Michael A Prisley
Case Number: 2:2017cv00161
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/03/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 5 the Magistrate Judge's 04/20/17 Report and Recommendation and overruling 11 the Plaintiff's Objections to the Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's federal claims are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2), and the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims, which are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 06/14/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 5 : Plaintiff's federal claims are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and the Court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims, which are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/11/2017. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Magistrate Judge GRANTS 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; RECOMMENDS that 4 Complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and DECLINE to exercise supplemental jurisdict ion over Plaintiff's remaining state-law claims, DISMISSING these claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/20/2017. (kdp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boddie v. Prisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Boddie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Prisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?