Easter v. Beacon Tri-State Staffing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Easter
Defendant: Beacon Tri-State Staffing, Inc. and C*MAC Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00197
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ROSS
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A. Jolson
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Quash. The requested documents in Plaintiff's subpoena concerning his unemployment compensation claim relating to his employment with Defendants shall be produced within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/17/2017. (ew)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/6/2017. (ew)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/24/2017. (ew)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easter v. Beacon Tri-State Staffing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Easter
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Tri-State Staffing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C*MAC Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?