McDonald v. Mount Carmel College of Nursing
Plaintiff: McDonald and Lauren McDonald
Defendant: Mount Carmel College of Nursing
Not Classified By Court: Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp
Case Number: 2:2017cv00251
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
February 21, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference reset for 3/28/2019 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: A telephonic status conference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson will be held on February 28, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., unless the dismissal entry is received prior to that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/10/2019. (daf)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: RR is adopted and affirmed Plaintiff motion for leave to file second amended complaint is granted, Plaintiff motion to remand is denied as moot and Defendant's motion for summary judgment is denied as moot. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 12/7/18. (sh)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying as moot #22 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #27 Motion to Remand; adopting and affirming Report and Recommendations #35 . Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 11/20/18. (sh)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER referring case to mediation before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp (ret.). Mediation set for 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM. Position Statements due via email by 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/20/2018. (ew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint filed by Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel)
November 1, 2018 Filing 36 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mount Carmel College of Nursing filed by Lauren McDonald. (ew)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge grants #28 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, RECOMMENDS denying as moot #22 Motion for Summary Judgment and #27 Motion to Remand. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2018. Discovery due by 1/30/2019. Dispositive motions due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/1/2018. (ew)
October 4, 2018 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel)
September 20, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel)
September 12, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
August 31, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
August 31, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
July 24, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 7/24/2018. (jr)
July 19, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/24/2018 @ 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Counsel are directed to join together on one line and call the Court at 614-719-3470. (jr)
July 13, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald of Appearance of Attorney Christina M. Spencer (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
July 13, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hollingsworth for Plaintiff Lauren McDonald (Hollingsworth, Jonathan)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time: Response to #22 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/31/2018; Reply due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/2/2018. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 29, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
June 11, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of Plaintiff) (Asensio, Manuel)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rick Louis Brunner and Patrick M Quinn terminated. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to inform the Court within 21 days whether she intends to retain other counsel or wishes to proceed pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/12/2018. (ew)
April 11, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Brunner, Rick)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time: Discovery due by 5/30/2018. Primary Expert due by 7/11/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/13/2018. Dispositive motions due by 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/14/2018. (ew)
February 14, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint filed by Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel)
February 13, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/30/2018. by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Brunner, Rick)
January 31, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mount Carmel College of Nursing, filed by Lauren McDonald. (Brunner, Rick)
January 22, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/1/2018. (er)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Leave to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date and to File Amended or Supplemental Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 1/31/2018. Discovery due by 3/1/2018. Dispositive motions due by 6/7/2018. Primary Expert due by 4/12/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 5/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/18/2018. (ew) Modified Discovery due date on 1/22/2018 (er).
January 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date and Motion for Leave to File Amended or Supplemental Complaint by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Brunner, Rick)
June 26, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Samuel E Endicott (Endicott, Samuel)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/16/2017. (ew)
May 16, 2017 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel) Modified text on 5/17/2017 (er).
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2017 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 8/10/2017. Primary Expert due by 2/26/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 3/28/2018. Discovery due by 1/15/2018. Dispositive motions due by 4/23/2018.If the parties intend to seek a protective order or clawback agreement, such order or agreement shall be produced to the Court by 6/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/12/2017. (ew)
May 11, 2017 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Lauren McDonald. (Quinn, Patrick)
May 1, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset for 5/18/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
April 27, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2017 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
April 5, 2017 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint filed by Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel)
March 29, 2017 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Mount Carmel College of Nursing, filed by Lauren McDonald (State Court Complaint filed in the Common Pleas Court of Franklin County, Ohio on 3/6/17). (sem)
March 29, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Asensio, Manuel)
March 29, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel E Endicott for Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing (Endicott, Samuel)
March 29, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Jose Asensio, III for Defendant Mount Carmel College of Nursing (Asensio, Manuel)
March 29, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 17-CV-002214 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5896901), filed by Mount Carmel College of Nursing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 All Other State Court Pleadings) (Asensio, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Mount Carmel College of Nursing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Carmel College of Nursing
Represented By: Samuel E Endicott
Represented By: Manuel Jose Asensio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren McDonald
Represented By: Rick Louis Brunner
Represented By: Jonathan Hollingsworth
Represented By: Patrick M Quinn
Represented By: Christina M Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp
Represented By: Terence P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?