Ashdown v. Buchanan et al
Plaintiff: |
Brandon J. Ashdown |
Defendant: |
Tim Buchanan and Charles Bradley |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00495 |
Filed: |
June 8, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Columbus Office |
County: |
NOBLE |
Presiding Judge: |
Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Presiding Judge: |
James L. Graham |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 10, 2021 |
Filing
191
OPINION AND ORDER granting 180 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 11/10/21. (ds)
|
June 28, 2021 |
Filing
166
OPINION AND ORDER granting 119 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendations re 155 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 6/28/21. (ds)
|
February 3, 2021 |
Filing
155
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that the Court GRANT the State of Ohio's Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Weil and the newly-added 17 Defendants. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 3, 2021. (jlk)
|
June 26, 2019 |
Filing
72
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Motion for DefaultJudgment 60 be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 26, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 21, 2019 |
Filing
62
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that the State of Ohio's Motion to Dismiss 48 be GRANTED. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any O rder adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 21, 2019. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendations re 24 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 2/2/2018. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 4, 2017 |
Filing
24
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It it is RECOMMENDED that 15 Defendants Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 4, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?