Obeidallah v. Anglin et al
Plaintiff: Dean Obeidallah
Defendant: Andrew B. Anglin, Moonbase Holdings, LLC and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv00720
Filed: August 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Use Greg Anglin's Deposition Testimony at the Evidentiary Hearing or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Issue a Subpoena for Greg Anglin's Appearance and Testimony. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/28/2019. (kk)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Obeidallah's Motion for Default Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 55 Obeidallah's Supplement. The Court enters judgment in Obeidallah's favor against Defendants regarding liability. To determine the proper amount of damages and fees, the Court will hold an evidentiary hearing at a later date. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/1/2019. (cmw)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AND OPINION: Plaintiffs Motion for Additional Discovery in Aid of Default Judgment 46 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file with the Court, ex parte and under seal, the complete subpoena with the full name of t he financial institution to which it will be issued within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order. The Court will then determine whether to keep the document under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 21, 2018. (jlk)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 31 Motion Discovery in Aid of Default Judgment against Defendant Moonbase Holdings, LLC. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written status report by 10/1/2018, unless he has filed a motion for default judgment against Defendant Moonbase Holdings, LLC prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 20, 2018. (jlk)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 23 Plt's Renewed Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery; Granting 24 Plt's Motion for Service by Publication; Denying As Moot 33 Plt's Motion to Extend Time for Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/13/2018. (sln)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART: re 17 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery in Aid of Service and Extend Time for Service. Plaintiff must effect service over Defendants by FEBRUARY 12, 2018. As the Motion relates to Plaintiff seeking the Court to authorize the broad request for expedited discovery, Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 9, 2017. (jlk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obeidallah v. Anglin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Obeidallah
Represented By: Subodh Chandra
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fawal
Represented By: Juvaria Saeed Khan
Represented By: Abid R. Qureshi
Represented By: Donald P Screen
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Johnathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew B. Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moonbase Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?