Tolliver v. Jefferies et al

Plaintiff: Kevin A. Tolliver
Defendant: Robert Jefferies, Abdul Rahman Shahid, Sunni Ali Islam, Mike Davis, Jeffery Noble, Major Taylor, Rochelle Moore, Christler, Sibalski, Davis, Cayhill, John and Jane Doe Staff and Administrators and Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections
Case Number: 2:2017cv00806
Filed: September 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: PICKAWAY
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 17 Report and Recommendations. The Report and Recommendation, Document 17, is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Plaintiffs Complaint in this case is hereby dismissed as duplicative of the aforementioned 2016 case. Plaintiff can pursue all his claims in the 2016 case. The Clerk shall remove Documents 17 and 18 from the Courts pending motions list. The Clerk shall close this case.. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 4/2/19. (sh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/28/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 9 in that this case is hereby STAYED pending resolution of Plaintiffs appeal of Tolliver v. Noble, et al., No. 2:16-cv-1020. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 2/13/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this action be stayed pending resolution of Plaintiff's appeal of 2:16-cv-1020. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/24/2018. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification, the Corrections Unit of the Ohio Attorney General's Office, and the Clerk of the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolliver v. Jefferies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jefferies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Rahman Shahid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunni Ali Islam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sibalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Staff and Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?