Doe One et al v. CVS Health Corporation et al

Plaintiff: John Doe One, John Doe Two and John Doe Three
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Caremark, L.L.C., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Fiserv, Inc., Fiserv Solutions, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv00238
Filed: March 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M. Vascura
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 49 Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Case with 2:18-cv-488. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/16/19. (sem)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/21/2018. (plb)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously. Plaintiffs may proceed in this action with the pseudonyms John Doe in place of their true identities. All documents filed with this Court that contain the full name of Plaintiffs, or contain information that identifies them, directly or indirectly, shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/26/2018. (kpt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe One et al v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe One
Represented By: Gerald S. Flanagan
Represented By: Edith Marie Kallas
Represented By: Terry L. Kilgore
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Benjamin R. Powell
Represented By: Henry C. Quillen
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe Two
Represented By: Gerald S. Flanagan
Represented By: Edith Marie Kallas
Represented By: Terry L. Kilgore
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Benjamin R. Powell
Represented By: Henry C. Quillen
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe Three
Represented By: Gerald S. Flanagan
Represented By: Edith Marie Kallas
Represented By: Terry L. Kilgore
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Benjamin R. Powell
Represented By: Henry C. Quillen
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Robert G Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert G Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert G Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv, Inc.
Represented By: James B Hadden
Represented By: Jory M. Hoffman
Represented By: David M Kroeger
Represented By: John H Mathias, Jr.
Represented By: Megan B. Poetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv Solutions, LLC
Represented By: James B Hadden
Represented By: Jory M. Hoffman
Represented By: David M Kroeger
Represented By: John H Mathias, Jr.
Represented By: Megan B. Poetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?