La Fond v. NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Molly La Fond
Defendant: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00763
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Algenon L Marbley
3 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to NetJets Aviation, Inc. on 8/7/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Knoll, Laren)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:18-cv-763 and 2:17-cv-526 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/13/2018. (daf)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against NetJets Aviation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6547979), filed by Molly La Fond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Knoll, Laren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Fond v. NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly La Fond
Represented By: Laren E Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?