Zell v. Mills

Plaintiff: Mr. Jonathan Roger Zell and Jonathan R. Zell
Defendant: Mr. Frank Stephen Mills and Frank Stephen Mills
Case Number: 2:2018cv00789
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
0 Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
1 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)(This document sent by email to plt.)
September 5, 2018 8 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer at to Defendant Mills. Answer due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/5/2018. (EPD)
September 4, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 10/4/2018. by Defendant Frank Stephen Mills. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Heck, Jeremiah)
August 14, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Frank Stephen Mills. Frank Stephen Mills served on 8/12/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Zell, Jonathan)
August 8, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Frank Stephen Mills. (ew)
August 7, 2018 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jonathan Roger Zell Notice of Intent to Use Process Server (Zell, Jonathan)
August 7, 2018 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jonathan Roger Zell Civil Cover Sheet (Zell, Jonathan)
August 7, 2018 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. As Soon As Possible Please (Zell, Jonathan)
August 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6549753), filed by Jonathan Roger Zell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2) (Zell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zell v. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jonathan Roger Zell
Represented By: Jonathan Roger Zell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan R. Zell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Frank Stephen Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Stephen Mills
Represented By: Jeremiah E Heck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?