Hairston v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Rico Isaih Hairston
Defendant: Mr. Byrd, Mr. May, Chad Haren, Shelbie Smith, Lauren A. Chalupa and Jeffery Mustard
Case Number: 2:2018cv00826
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: granting ECF No. #1 and #7 . It is RECOMMENDED this Court DISMISS Plaintiff's due process claims relating to his confinement in segregation and the alleged violations of state administrative regulations and policies and also his claims relating to asbestos and mold exposure WITHOUT PREJUDICE to continuing to prosecute those claims in the 378 Case. It is further RECOMMENDED that the remaining claims in this action, namely, Plaintiff's due process claims relating to his security classification and his equal protection claims, be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim pursuant to 1915(e)(2) and that ECF No. #2 and #3 be DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/25/2018. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Rico Isaih Hairston. (daf)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
September 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/15/2018. (agm)
September 14, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/15/2018. (ew)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to submit the statutorily-required certified copy of a trust fund account statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/14/2018. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE and MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (ew) Modified event type on 9/14/2018 (daf).
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (ew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit, within 30 days of the date of this order, the required trust fund statement from his prison's cashier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/14/2018. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 14, 2018 Set Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 9/13/2018. (daf)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Court Clerk to Make Service Copies of Complaint by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (ew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injuction by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (ew)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rico Isaih Hairston. (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Service Copies of Complaint, Summons Forms, and USM-285 Forms.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hairston v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rico Isaih Hairston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Haren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelbie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren A. Chalupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Mustard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?