Ochoa v. Bard et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Ochoa
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc, C.R. Bard, Inc., Bard Davol, Inc., T Rowe Price Group Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Becton Dickinson and Company, Ethicon Inc, Davol, Inc. and Ethicon US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00892
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
1 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1- Addressing Preliminary Issue and Setting an Status Conference for 9/5/2018 10:00 AM in Room 310 before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus.). Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/17/2018. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (daf).
August 16, 2018 Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (daf)
August 16, 2018 Filing 126 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:17-cv-00756. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2018 Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 125 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to Southern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2846. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Parties motion to extend stay is GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 123 STATUS REPORT by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #120 Defendant's Motion to Stay. The Defendants expect a decision from the JPML regarding the pending MDL Motion within 90 days. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 121 SUPPLEMENT to #120 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion to Stay by Johnson and Johnson, filed.(Gannaway, Geoff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 120 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion to Stay Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Johnson and Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gannaway, Geoff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 119 RETURN of Service Executed as to Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc. on April 10, 2018 re: Subpoena to Produce, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc. by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc. by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PATHOLOGY PROTOCOL ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Ethicon and J&J made an oral motion asking the Court to enter a pathology protocol order consistent with these rulings and the agreed upon paragraphs for the remainder of the protocol. Ethicon and J&Js motion is GRANTED, and the Court will enter such an order on the pathology protocol. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Telephone Status Conference held Mr. Alexander to email Court Word version of Pathology Protocol. Appearances: Eric L Alexander, Kathleen A Gallagher, Richard McLure Dye, Kassi Patrick Marks, Bradley Landon Leger. Ct Reporter: Yes. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 3/28/2018 at 03:00 PM at Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 113 Letter from Ethicon regarding Pathology by Ethicon, filed.(Gannaway, Geoff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 112 Letter re Pathology Protocol re #110 by BARD DAVOL, INC., Davol, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION for DiscoveryMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Matthew Ochoa, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2018. (Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER 1.The parties are to submit disputed paragraphs nos. 10, 19, and 25 of their draft Pathology Protocol to the Court as soon as possible. 2.Each Party may submit an explanation of its position on those paragraphs, limited to no more than two pages.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Telephone Status Conference held. Parties to submit disputed paragraphs of their draft Pathology Protocol to court as soon as possible. Each party may submit an explanation of its position no longer that 2 pages. Written order to follow. Appearances: Jeff Ganaway. Appearances: Eric L Alexander, Richard McLure Dye, Kassi Patrick Marks, Bradley Landon Leger. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 109 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #108 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephonic Status Hearing - Held in Chambers held on February 16, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Julie Hardin Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2018., filed. (mahenry, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc's Notice of Withdrawl of the Agreed Order and Stipulation Regarding Pathology Protocol for Preservation and Testing of Explants and Tissue Samples Taken From Plaintiff Matthew Ochoa and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice re: #106 Notice (Other), by Johnson and Johnson, filed. (Gannaway, Geoff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of the Agreed Order and Stipulation Regarding Pathology Protocol for Preservation and Testing of Explants and Tissue Samples Taken from Plaintiff Matthew Ochoa re: #105 Proposed Order, by Johnson and Johnson, filed. (Gannaway, Geoff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 105 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order and Stipulation Regarding Pathology Protocol for Preservation and Testing of Explants and Tissue Samples Taken from Plaintiff Matthew Ochoa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gannaway, Geoff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE to Withdraw Randy Canche by Matthew Ochoa, filed. (Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 103 Answer to #88 of C.R. Bard, Inc. and Davol, Inc. to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed.(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 102 REPLY to #88 Document Answer and Defenses of Defendant Johnson & Johnson to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, filed by Johnson and Johnson. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 101 REPLY to #88 Document Answer and Defenses of Defendant Ethicon, Inc. to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, filed by Ethicon, Inc.. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 100 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #99 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - HELD IN CHAMBERS held on 2/16/18 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party GEOFF A. GANNAWAY Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2018., filed. (thudson, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER on DEPOSITION(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Telephone Status Conference held. Court orders: 1. Counsel are to conduct themselves in a professional manner as officers of the court and consistent with their duties under the Lawyers Creed. 2. Plaintiffs counsel shall stay within the scope of discovery as the Court previously outlined. 3.Bards counsel may instruct his witnesses not to answer questions that are outside the scope of the Courts rulings, but does so at his peril of another deposition if the Court does not agree with his instructions.Written order to follow. Ct Reporter: No. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 96 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Julie Hardin for Transcript of Telephone Status Conference on 2/16/18. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Reporter, filed. (Hardin, Julie) Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers of Texas on 2/26/2018. Estimated transcript completion date: 3/12/2018. (LaurenWebster, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Ketchum on behalf of Matthew Ochoa, filed. (Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Deft Expert Report due by 6/15/2018. Discovery due by 8/15/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/12/2018. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/11/2019. Mediation due by 8/29/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/12/2018. Pltf Expert Report due by 5/11/2018. Docket Call set for 1/25/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Telephone Status Conference held. Court held hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadlines. Written Order to follow. Appearances: Eric L Alexander, Curtis R. Waldo, Richard McLure Dye, Kassi Patrick Marks, Bradley Landon Leger. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 92 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Geoff Gannaway for Transcript of Telephone Status Conference on 02/16/18 before Judge Palermo. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Reporter, filed. (Gannaway, Geoff) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 2/16/2018. Estimated completion date 2/23/2018. Modified on 2/16/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Filing 91 RESPONSE to #90 Order requested by Magistrate Palermo re Motion to Extend Schedule, filed by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc.. (Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. Responses due by 2/15/2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 89 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #85 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 88 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Matthew Ochoa, filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 87 Letter to Court re: Expedited Consideration by Matthew Ochoa, filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 86 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff's First Opposed and Unopposed Motion to Extend Certain Items of the Docket Control Order and Request for Expedited ConsiderationMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Matthew Ochoa, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Bradley L Leger, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephone Conference held on January 31, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judicial Transcribers of Texas, LLC. Ordering Party Julie Harden Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018., filed. (mahenry, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 84 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Julie Hardin for Transcript of Transcript of Pre-Motion Conference on January 31, 2018 before Judge Palermo. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested.. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Reporter, filed. Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers on 2/2/2018. Estimated completion date 2/3/2018. (Hardin, Julie) Modified on 2/2/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Ct Reporter: ERO., Plaintiff is permitted to reschedule the depositions of the corporate representatives for C.R. Bard, Inc. and Davol Inc. Counsel will agree to a tentative schedule and the order of the witnesses to be deposed over a two day period. Written Order to follow.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 82 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Geoff Gannaway for Transcript of Pre-Motion Hearing on 01/21/18 before Judge Palermo. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Judicial Transcribers on 2/2/2018. Estimated completion date 3/2/2018. Modified on 2/2/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 81 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bradley Leger for Transcript of Pre-Motion Conference on January 31, 2018 before Judge Palermo. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Reporter, filed. (Leger, Bradley)Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers on 2/2/2018. Estimated completion date 2/3/2018. Modified on 2/2/2018 (ShoshanaArnow, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 80 PROPOSED ORDER on Plaintiff's Matters for the Corporate Representative Deposition(s) of Defendant Davol, Inc., filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 79 PROPOSED ORDER on Plaintiff's Matters for the Corporate Representative Deposition(s) of Defendant C.R. Bard, Inc., filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Hearing Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Pre-motion conference Hearing Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Matthew Ochoa, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2018. (Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Chad R. Hutchinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION for Chad R. Hutchinson to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Filing 74 Supplemental CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed.(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Status Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/4/2018. Appearances:(ERO:Lauren Webster), filed.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Daniel K Winters to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for Daniel K. Winters to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2018. (Waldo, Curtis) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 70 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #69 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/7/17 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party BRADLEY LEGER Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2018., filed. (thudson, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 8, 2017 Filing 68 Vacation letter by Matthew Ochoa, filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/7/2017. Appearances:Curtis Waldo, Jeff Gannaway. Eric L Alexander, Richard McLure Dye, Kassi Patrick Marks, Bradley Landon Leger.(ERO:Yes), filed.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 67 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bradley Leger for Transcript of Telephone conference on 12/7/17 before Magistrate Judge Palermo. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Reporter, filed. (Leger, Bradley) Electronically forwarded to JTT 12/7/2017. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 12/13/2017. [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 66 Letter to Court responding to Plaintiffs by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 65 Letter to Court by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 12/7/2017 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo.( Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 63 Letter to Court by Matthew Ochoa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 62 ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed.(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 61 AMENDED ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 60 AMENDED ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Johnson and Johnson, filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 59 AMENDED ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon US, LLC, filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 58 AMENDED ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc., filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 57 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #56 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 12, 2017 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT re: DISCOVERY HEARING held on 10/30/17 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party BRADLEY LEGER Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2018., filed. (thudson, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 1/4/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 12/7/2017 at 11:00 PM Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROTECTIVE ORDER #51 Motion for Protective Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) (Attachments: #1 Agreement) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER regarding hearing on Discovery held 10/30/2017(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Protective OrderMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Ethicon, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon US, LLC, Johnson and Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cowan, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 50 Transcript Order Request by BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. Bard, filed.(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Eric Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Matthew D Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 47 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Matthew Ochoa.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 46 Transcript Order by Johnson and Johnson, filed.(Gannaway, Geoff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 45 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bradley Leger for Transcript of Hearing on Discovery Dispute on 10/30/17 before Judge Palermo. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Reporter, filed. (Leger, Bradley) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional 10/31/2017. Estimated Transcript Completion Date: 11/7/2017. [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Discovery Hearing held. Parties to file Agreed Protective Order by 11/3/2017. Defendant Bard is to supplement responses to plaintiff's requests for production consistent with the rulings on the record. Plaintiff's request to deem Bard's responses to Plaintiff's request for admissions is DENIED. Defendant Bard's response to interrogatory #1 shall be supplemented within 2 weeks, remaining responses to Plaintiff's interrogatories will be supplemented in the normal course of discovery. Appearances: Julie A Hardin, Eric Alexander Richard McLure Dye, by phone. Appearances: Kassi Patrick Marks, Bradley Landon Leger, Curtis Waldo Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 44 Letter to Court re Discovery by BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. Bard, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for Matthew D. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2017. (Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for Eric L. Alexander to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by C.R. Bard, Davol, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2017. (Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 10/30/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. Responses due by noon on 10/30/2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 39 Letter to Court re: Bard's Discovery by Matthew Ochoa, filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 38 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #37 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT re: INITIAL CONFERENCE held on 7-27-17 before Judge Nancy F Atlas. ERO Monica Balboa/Transcriber GLR. Ordering Party: Kathleen A. Gallagher. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2017., filed. (gwreed, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 36 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ethicon, Inc./Kathleen Gallagher for Transcript of Scheduling Conference on July 27, 2017 before Judge Atlas. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Contract Court Reporter, filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) Electronically forwarded to GLR on 8/1/2017. Estimated Completion date 8/8/2017. Modified on 8/1/2017 (ShoshanaArnow, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 10 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/16/2017 Pltf Expert Report due by 3/12/2018. Deft Expert Report due by 4/16/2018. Rebuttal Opinions due 5/14/2018 Discovery due by 6/15/2018. Mediation due by 6/29/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/12/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/12/2018. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2018. Docket Call set for 11/14/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial conference held Appearances: Curtis Waldo, Geoffrey Gannaway, Christopher Cowan. Appearances: Julie A Hardin, Bradley Landon Leger. Ct Reporter: ERO. Docket control order to follow.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 33 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. Bard, filed.(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 32 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Matthew Ochoa, filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 31 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Johnson and Johnson, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 30 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 29 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon US, Inc., filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. Bard, filed.(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. Bard, filed.(Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #22 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint , or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike and Motion for More Definite Statement of Portions of Plaintiff's Original Complaint, filed by Matthew Ochoa. (Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Matthew Ochoa.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint , or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike and Motion for More Definite Statement of Portions of Plaintiff's Original Complaint by BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. Bard, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/27/2017. (Hardin, Julie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Continuance Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 7/20/2017. Initial Conference set for 7/27/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) Modified on 5/16/2017 (sashabranner, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Unopposed Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Matthew Ochoa, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/2/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Continuance)(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Joint Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Matthew Ochoa, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/2/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Joint Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference)(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Kassi Dee Patrick Marks Admission Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
May 4, 2017 Summons Issued as to BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. Bard. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed. (wbostic, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 17 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Matthew Ochoa, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint for both Summons, #2 Summons)(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Ochoa, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2017. (Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Richard McLure Dye to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 25, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Dye on behalf of Ethicon, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon US, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, filed. (Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 25, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Richard M. Dye to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ethicon, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon US, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson and Johnson, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson and Johnson, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon US, Inc. identifying Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc identifying Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon US, Inc., filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
April 11, 2017 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon, filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 21, 2017 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 17, 2017 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 16, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons)(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 9, 2017 Filing 3 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matthew Ochoa, filed.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]
March 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18038301) filed by Matthew Ochoa.(Leger, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa v. Bard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc
Represented By: Richard McLure Dye
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Represented By: Kathleen A Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Waldo
Represented By: Julie Alleen Hardin
Represented By: Eric L. Alexander
Represented By: Matthew D Jacobson
Represented By: Daniel K. Winters
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Davol, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Alleen Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Rowe Price Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Richard McLure Dye
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Represented By: Kathleen A Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton Dickinson and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Richard McLure Dye
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Represented By: Kathleen A Gallagher
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Waldo
Represented By: Julie Alleen Hardin
Represented By: Eric L. Alexander
Represented By: Matthew D Jacobson
Represented By: Daniel K. Winters
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon US, LLC
Represented By: Richard McLure Dye
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Represented By: Kathleen A Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Ochoa
Represented By: Bradley Landon Leger
Represented By: Kassi Patrick Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?