Harris v. Harris

Plaintiff: James B. Harris
Defendant: Rhoda J. Harris
Case Number: 2:2018cv00896
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Order on Motion to Remand. Certified Mail receipt 7009 2820 0003 5801 4872. (jlk)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 The Clerk's office has mailed via certified mail (7009 2820 0003 5801 4872) a certified copy of the Order #7 remanding this case to Franklin County Court of Common Pleas and a certified copy of the docket sheet. (jlk)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand. This case is remanded to the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/12/2018. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 Response in opposition re #5 Notice of Withdrawal of Document by Plaintiff James B. Harris. (jlk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Rhoda J. Harris re #1 Notice of Removal, (Schrader, Matthew)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff James B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jlk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Rhoda J. Harris, filed by James B. Harris. (jlk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint #3 with Jury Demand filed by Rhoda J. Harris. (Schrader, Matthew) Modified text on 8/20/2018 (jlk).
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 18 CV 004766 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6563007), filed by Rhoda J. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5) (Schrader, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhoda J. Harris
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Schrader
Represented By: Franklin C Malemud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?