Turner v. Menard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel J Turner
Defendant: Menard, Inc. and Doe Corporation I dba Menards
Case Number: 2:2018cv00932
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the June, 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2019. Motions to Amend due by 1/4/2019. Primary Expert due by 7/30/2019. Discovery due by 6/30/2019. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by11/30/2018. Dispositive motions due by 9/15/2019. Settlement Demand due by 11/30/2018. Response to Settlement Demand due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 11, 2018. (jlk)
October 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/11/2018. (sln)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Menard, Inc.. (Jewell, Jackie)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Defendant Menard, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Menard, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Doe Corporation I dba Menards, Menard, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6568417), filed by Daniel J Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint) (McKitrick, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Menard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Jackie M. Jewell
Represented By: D Patrick Kasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation I dba Menards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Turner
Represented By: Stanley Bruce Dritz
Represented By: Daniel Chadd McKitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?