America's Floor Source, LLC v. Rite Rug Co.
Plaintiff: America's Floor Source, LLC
Defendant: Rite Rug Co.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00953
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
2 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff America's Floor Source, LLC. (Kuhl, John)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 Rite Rug Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Rite Rug Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Aug. 9 E-Mail, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Aug. 9 E-Mail, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Aug. 24 E-Mail) (Radel, Victor)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Rite Rug Co. re #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Radel, Victor)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Jaredd Flynn for Defendant Rite Rug Co. (Flynn, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Rite Rug Co. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (er)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rite Rug Co.. (Radel, Victor)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor D. Radel for Defendant Rite Rug Co. (Radel, Victor)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: The complaint and issued summons were sent via certified mail to the Defendant. (ew)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/27/2018. (agm)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rite Rug Co. (ew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Kuhl, John)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff America's Floor Source. (Kuhl, John)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Rite Rug Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6573542), filed by America's Floor Source. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Registrations for America's Floor Source's Service Mark "Our Showroom to Your Living Room", #2 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter dated August 8, 2018, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Certification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kuhl, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: America's Floor Source, LLC v. Rite Rug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Rug Co.
Represented By: Victor D. Radel
Represented By: John Jaredd Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America's Floor Source, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R Miller
Represented By: Jessica Knopp Cunning
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?