In re: Vickie M. Stringer
Defendant: Vickie M. Stringer
Appellant: Sterling A. Williams and Percy Squire
Interested Party: US Bankruptcy Court - Columbus
Appellee: Vickie M Stringer
Case Number: 2:2018cv00979
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 11/26/2018. by Appellant Percy Squire. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Squire, Percy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/25/2018. Appellee Brief due by 11/8/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 Appellee Designation) (er)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The parties briefing schedule will be established once the District Court receives the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 2:17-bk-51730. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Cover Sheet, #3 doc 156- Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Memorandum Opinion, #4 Doc 171- Final Judgment, #5 Doc 188- Order Denying Motion of Percy Squire to Alter or Amend Judgment) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Vickie M. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie M. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sterling A. Williams
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Percy Squire
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bankruptcy Court - Columbus
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vickie M Stringer
Represented By: John Matthew Fisher
Represented By: James Alan Coutinho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?