Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Acord et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Glen Acord and Acords Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01014
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 Letter/MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Glen Acord. (eh)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Acords Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc.'s #9 Answer to Complaint. Defendant Acords Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc. is ADVISED that it must retain counsel to represent it and to file a response to the Complaint on its behalf within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order. This Defendant is CAUTIONED that failure to comply with this Order shall result in the recommendation that the Clerk enter default against them and that Plaintiff be permitted to move for default judgment against it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/16/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Complaint as to Acord's Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc Only by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Glen Acord. (eh) Modified on 10/16/2018 to reflect that the answer filed on behalf of Acords Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc. was stricken per the Court's 10/16/18 Order (sem).
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Acords Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (eh)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Glen Acord served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (eh)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on September 19, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Glen Acord, Acords Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc. (sct)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On Acord Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc (Koberg, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on Glen Acord (Koberg, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6590070), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Koberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Acord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Acord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acords Pizza Sub & Pub, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L Koberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?