Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant: Treasurer of Franklin County, Benny Smith, Della R Smith and The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01035
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Brooke D Turner-Bautista substituting for Ethan Clunk as to Plaintiff Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Benny Smith as to #1 Notice of Removal. (er)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Ethan J. Clunk and Robert R. Hoose. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 8/10/2018 by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. against Benny Smith, Della R Smith, The United States of America(c/o U.S. Attorney General), The United States of America(c/o U.S. District Attorney) & Treasurer of Franklin County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (er)
September 11, 2018 Filing fee for removal: $ 400, receipt number 200COL053759. (er)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Della R Smith & Benny Smith from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18CV6868. (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheets) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of Franklin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Della R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Brooke D Turner-Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?