RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC et al v. Stewart
Plaintiff: Firefly Agency LLC and RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Merrilee Stewart and Norman L. Fountain
Counter Defendant: Fritz Griffioen, Rodney Mayhill and William Griffioen
3Rd Party Defendant: James R. Carnes, Esq.
Counter Claimant: Linda Resch, Kevin Becker, John Mathers, Michael W. Denys, Maria R. Adrion and Ted Lewicki
Case Number: 2:2018cv01132
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 Response re #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC, Firefly Agency LLC Response to Objection to Magistrate's Report and Recommendations by Plaintiffs Firefly Agency LLC, RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC. (Kemp, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Merrilee Stewart, ThirdParty Plaintiff Merrilee Stewart, Counter Claimant Merrilee Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jlk)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Joinder by Counter Claimant Ted Lewicki (jlk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Joinder of Counterclaim Plaintiff Kevin Becker. (jlk)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Joinder of Counterclaim by Counter Claimant John Mathers. (jlk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS granting #4 Motion to Remand. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/29/2018. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Firefly Agency LLC, RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC. (Carnes, James)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Merrilee Stewart, ThirdParty Plaintiff Merrilee Stewart, Counter Claimant Merrilee Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (jlk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Joinder of Linda Resch and Maria R. Adrion and COUNTERCLAIM against Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen, Rodney Mayhill, filed by Maria R. Adrion, Linda Resch. (jlk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JOINDER OF COUNTERCLAIM against Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen and Rodney Mayhill filed by Michael W. Denys. (sem) Modified date filed on 10/23/2018 (jlk).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiffs shall have until 14 days following ruling on their pending Motion to Remand to respond to Defendant's First Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/16/2018. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 10/29/2018. by Counter Defendant Firefly Agency LLC, Plaintiffs Firefly Agency LLC, RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC. (Kemp, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM AND NOTICE OF JOINDER OF PARTY. Amended Third-Party Complaint against James R. Carnes, Esq, Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen, Rodney Mayhill, filed by Merrilee Stewart, Norman L. Fountain. (jlk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Firefly Agency LLC, RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision) (Kemp, Matthew)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against James R. Carnes, Esq and COUNTERCLAIM against Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen & Rodney Mayhill filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 9/25/2018 by Merrilee Stewart. (er)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 8/23/2018 by RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC & Firefly Agency LLC against Merrilee Stewart. (er)
September 27, 2018 Filing fee for removal: $ 400, receipt number 200COL053977. (er)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Merrilee Stewart from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18CV007212. (Attachments: #1 Answer - State Court, #2 Complaint - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC et al v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firefly Agency LLC
Represented By: James R Carnes
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RRL Holding Company of Ohio, LLC
Represented By: James R Carnes
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Merrilee Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Norman L. Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Fritz Griffioen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Rodney Mayhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: William Griffioen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James R. Carnes, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Linda Resch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kevin Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: John Mathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael W. Denys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Maria R. Adrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ted Lewicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?