United Steel , Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union et al v. Titanium Metals Corporation
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union and United Steelworkers, Local Union 5644
Defendant: Titanium Metals Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01232
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - The Merit Hearing is now scheduled for December 21, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. The Court DIRECTS Defendant Titanium Metals Corporation to file a memorandum in support of its position by December 18, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/12/2018. (cmw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Merit Hearing set for 12/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
December 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/12/2018. The hearing set for December 14, 2018 is VACATED. The Merit Hearing is now set for December 21, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Titanium Metals Corporation is to file a memorandum in support of its position by December 18, 2018. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephone Status Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers, Local Union 5644. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Allen, Bennett)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Merit Hearing RESET for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The hearing set for November 19, 2018 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/16/2018. (plb)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by United Steelworkers, Local Union 5644. (Allen, Bennett)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/3/2018. by Defendant Titanium Metals Corporation. (Burgett, Catherine)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER outlining agenda for hearing on November 19, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/2/2018. (cmw)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nancy A. Parker is GRANTED , conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within (14) days of date of this Order. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/1/2018. (daf)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6662241) of Nancy A. Parker by Plaintiffs United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers, Local Union 5644. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Cook, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by All Defendants. (Burgett, Catherine)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Nancy A. Parker (jlk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6638784), filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers, Local Union 5644. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Cook, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Steel , Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union et al v. Titanium Metals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union
Represented By: David M. Cook
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: Nancy A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steelworkers, Local Union 5644
Represented By: David M. Cook
Represented By: Bennett P. Allen
Represented By: Nancy A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titanium Metals Corporation
Represented By: George Edward Yund
Represented By: Catherine Frost Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?