VanAuken et al v. Severino Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Keri VanAuken and Mr. Chad VanAuken
Defendant: J Severino Construction, Inc., Severino Construction, Inc. and Joseph M Stein
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Lauren Bugansky
Case Number: 2:2018cv01246
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ThirdParty Plaintiff Lauren Bugansky, Plaintiffs Chad VanAuken, Keri VanAuken (Melick, Gregory)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/4/2018. (ew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Chad VanAuken, Keri VanAuken (Melick, Gregory)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Joseph M Stein filed by Lauren Bugansky. (Havens, Hunter)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to J Severino Construction, Inc. & Severino Construction, Inc. (er)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Melick, Gregory)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lauren Bugansky, J Severino Construction, Inc. and Severino Construction, Inc.. (sem)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Melick, Gregory)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6639950), filed by Chad VanAuken, Keri VanAuken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoverSheet) (Melick, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanAuken et al v. Severino Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Severino Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Hunter Scott Havens
Represented By: Terese Marie Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Severino Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Hunter Scott Havens
Represented By: Terese Marie Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Keri VanAuken
Represented By: Gregory H Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Chad VanAuken
Represented By: Gregory H Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Lauren Bugansky
Represented By: Hunter Scott Havens
Represented By: Terese Marie Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?