Snyder Development Company v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Snyder Development Company
Defendant: FD Gahanna Ohio Agler Road LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: AutoZone Development LLC and Autozone, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01274
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The November 29, 2018 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. This case is referred to the June 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2019. Motions to Amend due by 1/31/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 1/15/2019. Primary Expert due by 7/1/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/1/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2019. Settlement Demand due by 3/1/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/26/2018. (daf)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant AutoZone Development LLC. (Young, Jeremy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Autozone, Inc.. (Young, Jeremy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ThirdParty Plaintiff Autozone, Inc., Defendant Autozone, Inc.. (Young, Jeremy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against FD Gahanna Ohio Agler Road LLC, filed by AutoZone Development LLC, Autozone, Inc.. (Young, Jeremy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint [Answer of Defendants, Autozone, Inc. and Autozone Development LLC] filed by AutoZone Development LLC, Autozone, Inc.. (Young, Jeremy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Gary B. Gitlitz (jlk)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AutoZone Development LLC, Autozone, Inc., filed by Snyder Development Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (jlk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 18CV007864 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6647191), filed by Autozone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Documents filed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Young, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder Development Company v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: AutoZone Development LLC
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Jones
Represented By: Jeremy Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Autozone, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Young
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snyder Development Company
Represented By: Bryan Bright Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FD Gahanna Ohio Agler Road LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?