Bartolotta et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bruce Bartolotta and Donna Bartolotta
Defendant: C.R.Bard, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01307
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 12/28/2018) by Plaintiff Dianna R. McClain. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (Morgan, Crystal)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C.R. Bard, Inc. (ew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Bruce Bartolotta, Donna Bartolotta re #1 Complaint (Colella, Alexandra) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (ew).
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Colella, Alexandra)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Donna Bartolotta against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6653243), filed by Donna Bartolotta, Bruce Bartolotta. (Colella, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartolotta et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Bartolotta
Represented By: Alexandra Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Bartolotta
Represented By: Alexandra Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R.Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?