Kovach v. Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company

Plaintiff: Aleta L. Kovach
Defendant: Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01339
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 3:18-cv-02826, filed 12/10/2018. (er)
December 7, 2018 Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Granting #2 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company's 12(b)(3) Motion to Transfer to Proper Venue filed by Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company. The Clerk is DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 6, 2018. (jlk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company's 12(b)(3) Motion to Transfer to Proper Venue filed by Plaintiff Aleta L. Kovach. (Baker, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Wheeling & Lake Erie Railway Company's 12(b)(3) Motion to Transfer to Proper Venue by Defendant Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Heidi Rowlands) (Schmiege, Quinn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6660447), filed by Aleta L. Kovach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baker, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kovach v. Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeling and Lake Erie Railway Company
Represented By: Quinn M. Schmiege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleta L. Kovach
Represented By: Andrew S Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?