United States of America et al v. Brigadier Construction Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thompson Concrete Construction LTD and United States of America
Defendant: Brigadier Construction Services LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01345
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Brigadier Construction Services LLC on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Edwards, Daniel)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Thompson Concrete Construction LTD. (Edwards, Daniel)
October 31, 2018 Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati on 10/31/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-744. Case assigned to Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (eh)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the Eastern Division at Columbus of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/30/18. (eh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff The United States of America, ex rel., Thompson Concrete Construction Ltd. re #1 Complaint, CIVIL COVER SHEET (Edwards, Daniel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brigadier Construction Services LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6658237), filed by The United States of America, ex rel., Thompson Concrete Construction Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Edwards, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Brigadier Construction Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigadier Construction Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson Concrete Construction LTD
Represented By: Daniel Finley Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?