Algorithm, Inc. et al v. ECi Macola/MAX, LLC
Plaintiff: Fannin Consulting, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., iPro, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Algorithm, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Red Deer Ventures, Inc. and Exceptional Software Solutions LLC
Defendant: ECi Macola/MAX, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01394
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Settlement Conference held on 12/20/2018. (agm)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Setting Mediation Conference: Mediation set for 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Joseph P Kinneary U S Courthouse 85 Marconi Blvd Columbus OH 43215 before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/13/2018. (agm)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for settlement purposes only. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/13/2018. (agm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Reback for Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC (Reback, Lydia)
December 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/7/2018. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument set for 12/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
December 6, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in Teleconference before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
December 3, 2018 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Organ, Shawn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 and #26 Motions to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/26/2018. (ew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey Ralyea) (Gilligan, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to File Document Under Seal Defendant ECI Macola/MAX, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gilligan, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jerome Twombly for Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc. (Twombly, David)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Regarding Telephone Status Conference held on 11/13/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/14/2018. (cmw)
November 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/13/2018. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/13/2018. (cmw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/13/2018 at03:00 PM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Gilligan for Defendant ECi Macola/MAX, LLC (Gilligan, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Algorithm, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, DataSpring, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Fannin Consulting, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Software Solutions, Inc., Triangle Partners, Inc., iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Triangle Partners, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Donas Group, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Software Solutions, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Red Deer Ventures, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff iPro, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fannin Consulting, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Exceptional Software Solutions LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff DataSpring, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Copious Solutions, LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Business Computer Technologies, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Attivo Group, LLC. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Algorithm, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against ECi Macola/MAX, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6672044), filed by Exceptional Software Solutions LLC, Red Deer Ventures, Inc., Business Computer Technologies, Inc., Fannin Consulting, Inc., iPro, Inc., Attivo Group, LLC, Triangle Partners, Inc., Donas Group, Inc., Algorithm, Inc., Copious Solutions, LLC, Software Solutions, Inc., Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C., DataSpring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Organ, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Algorithm, Inc. et al v. ECi Macola/MAX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannin Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triangle Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copious Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DataSpring, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iPro, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donas Group, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayer, Shanzer & Mayer, P.C.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Algorithm, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Software Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attivo Group, LLC
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Computer Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Deer Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exceptional Software Solutions LLC
Represented By: Shawn J Organ
Represented By: David Jerome Twombly
Represented By: Sean M. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECi Macola/MAX, LLC
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: John Patrick Gilligan
Represented By: Steven David Forry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?