United States v. GS Caltex Corp. et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd., GS Caltex Corp. and SK Energy Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01456
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTATION ORDER granting #21 , #22 & #23 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott D. Hammond, Daniel G. Swanson and Melissa Phan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/14/2018. (er)
December 14, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by Defendant GS Caltex Corp. re #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Swanson, #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Melissa Phan, #26 Docket Annotation of Corrected Certificates of Good Standing for Daniel Swanson and Melissa Phan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Daniel Swanson, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Melissa Phan) (Wilson, James)
December 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 12/27/2018. (er)
December 13, 2018 Filing 27 DEFICIENCY NOTICE regarding PHV motions for Scott D. Hammond. (er)
December 13, 2018 Filing 26 DEFICIENCY NOTICE regarding PHV motions for Daniel Swanson and Melissa Phan. (er)
December 10, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ferrara for Defendant Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd. (Ferrara, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by Defendant GS Caltex Corp. of Certification Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 16(g) (Wilson, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing fee for 3 PHV's (Phan, Swanson & Hammond): $ 600, receipt number 200COL054912. (er)
December 6, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Melissa Phan by Defendant GS Caltex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Scott Hammond by Defendant GS Caltex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Swanson by Defendant GS Caltex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wilson, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James Allison Wilson, Jr for Defendant GS Caltex Corp. (Wilson, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Defendant SK Energy Co., Ltd. of Report of Compliance With Antitrust Procedures and Penalties Act Requirements (Romero, Alexia)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTATION ORDER granting #16 & #17 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Phillip A. Warren and Daniel N. Shallman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/30/2018. (er)
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6695800) of Daniel N. Shallman by Defendant SK Energy Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Romero, Alexia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6695673) of Phillip H. Warren by Defendant SK Energy Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Romero, Alexia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexia Romero for Defendant SK Energy Co., Ltd. (Romero, Alexia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Defendant Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd. OF REPORT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ANTITRUST PROCEDURES AND PENALTIES ACT REQUIREMENTS (Crites, D)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notation Order: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kelly B. Kramer and William Stallings #11 and #12 is GRANTED, conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on November 21, 2018. (jlk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6687848) of William Stallings by Defendant Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Crites, D) Modified on 11/21/2018 (jlk).
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6687796) of Kelly B. Kramer by Defendant Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Crites, D)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by D Michael Crites for Defendant Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd. (Crites, D)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/15/2018. (daf)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION With Defendant SK Energy Co., Ltd. by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment) (Malek, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION With Defendant Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd. by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment) (Malek, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION With Defendant GS Caltex Corp. by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment) (Malek, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States Competitive Impact Statement (Malek, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States Explanation of Consent Decree Procedures (Malek, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Malek, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet With Attachment) (Malek, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. GS Caltex Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanjin Transportation Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly B. Kramer
Represented By: William Stallings
Represented By: Michael Ferrara
Represented By: D Michael Crites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Caltex Corp.
Represented By: Melissa Phan
Represented By: Daniel G. Swanson
Represented By: Scott D. Hammond
Represented By: James Allison Wilson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Energy Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel N. Shallman
Represented By: Alexia Romero
Represented By: Phillip H. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Andrew M Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?