MIMB Investments LLC v. Merklin et al

Plaintiff: MIMB Investments LLC
Defendant: PNC Mortgage, Delaware County Treasurer, National City Mortgage Co., Matt Merklin, Jennifer Merklin, Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01502
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER construing #8 Stipulation as a Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, which is granted as to MIMB Investments LLC: Answer to #7 Counterclaim due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/11/2019. (ew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time To Answer Counterclaims by Plaintiff MIMB Investments LLC. (Coutinho, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against MIMB Investments LLC filed by Jennifer Merklin, Matt Merklin. (Donovan, Christian)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Delaware County Treasurer. (Villio, Vince)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - James Alan Coutinho substituting for Neil C. Sander as to Plaintiff MIMB Investments LLC. (Coutinho, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant United States of America's ANSWER to #2 Complaint, and, CROSSCLAIM of the United States against Jennifer Merklin, Matt Merklin filed by United States of America. (Wolfe, Leah)
November 21, 2018 Set Deadlines: Answers due 11/28/2018. (ew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint originally filed in Delaware County Court of Common Pleas on 11/5/2018 by Delaware County Treasurer. (ew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Matt Merklin, Jennifer Merklin, National City Mortgage Co., PNC Mortgage, United States of America, and Delaware County Treasurer originally filed in Delaware County Court of Common Pleas on 10/22/2018 by MIMB Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18 CV E 10 0584, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Docket, #3 Exhibit C-Delaware County Treasurer Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Wolfe, Leah) Modified text on 11/26/2018 (ew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIMB Investments LLC v. Merklin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware County Treasurer
Represented By: Vince James Villio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Merklin
Represented By: Matthew T Anderson
Represented By: Christian Daniel Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Merklin
Represented By: Matthew T Anderson
Represented By: Christian Daniel Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Leah M. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Leah M. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIMB Investments LLC
Represented By: John Matthew Fisher
Represented By: Neil Sander
Represented By: James Alan Coutinho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?