Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. v. Heatherton Drive, L.P.

Plaintiff: Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.
Defendant: Heatherton Drive, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01514
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Telephone Conference held on 1/10/2019. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Status Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. Counsel are to call 888.684.8852, access code 3470668#. (jk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. (Chase, Kenneth)
January 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Plaintiff Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. re #14 Order on Motion for TRO Joint Notice re: Court's December 6, 2018 Order (Chase, Kenneth)
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Heatherton Drive, L.P. re #16 Notice of Appearance for Jesse L. Taylor (Taylor, Jesse)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Heatherton Drive, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Taylor, Jesse)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Heatherton Drive, L.P.. (Taylor, Jesse)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse L. Taylor for Defendant Heatherton Drive, L.P. (Taylor, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendant Heatherton Drive, L.P. served on 12/3/2018. (ew)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/6/18. (jk)
December 4, 2018 Set Deadlines: Heatherton Drive, L.P. answer due 12/21/2018. (ew)
December 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Telephone Conference held on 12/4/2018. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Craig Woods and Andrew H. King for Defendant Heatherton Drive, L.P. (Woods, C. Craig) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (ew).
December 4, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Status Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. Counsel are to call 888.684.8852, access code 3470668# (jk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Heatherton Drive, L.P. c/o Registered Agent Kenneth J. Fisher, Esq. Served on 11/30/2018. Answer due 12/21/2018. (Chase, Kenneth) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (ew).
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of T. Menowitz, #2 Exhibit Letter dated 11/14/2018, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of S. Costello, #4 Exhibit Email dated 11/14/2018, #5 Exhibit Letter dated 11/20/2018, #6 Exhibit Letter dated 11/29/2018, #7 Text of Proposed Order) (Chase, Kenneth)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth E. Chase conditional upon counsel registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/30/2018. (ew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6698135) of Kenneth E Chase by Plaintiff Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. (Costello, Shannon)
November 29, 2018 Set Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 12/13/2018. (ew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency re #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth E. Chase. (ew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6695845) of Kenneth E Chase by Plaintiff Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. (Costello, Shannon)
November 28, 2018 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0648-6695845. (Costello, Shannon)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: The clerk performed service by certified mail on November 28, 2018, of the complaint, document 1, and summons, document 5, to Heatherton Drive, L.P., c/o Kenneth J. Fisher, Esq. (Registered Agent), 1414 Terminal Tower, 50 Public Square, Cleveland, OH 44113, Article Number (7017 3040 0000 3664 2333). (kma)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Heatherton Drive, L.P.. (kma)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Heatherton Drive, L.P. (Costello, Shannon)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. re #1 Complaint CIVIL COVER SHEET (Gentry, Daniel)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. (Gentry, Daniel)
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heatherton Drive, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6690474), filed by Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. (Gentry, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. v. Heatherton Drive, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heatherton Drive, L.P.
Represented By: Jesse L. Taylor
Represented By: C. Craig Woods
Represented By: Andrew H King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jerome Gentry
Represented By: Shannon Lesley Costello
Represented By: Kenneth E. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?