J&R Passmore, LLC et al v. Rice Drilling D, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Doreen Butler, Bruce Schuster, J&R Passmore, LLC, Cheryl Feiock, Brent Butler, Jennifer Schuster and Ryan Feiock
Defendant: Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Rice Drilling D, LLC, Antero Resources Corporation, Ascent Resources-Utica LLC, EQT Corporation, Hess Ohio Developments, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation and XTO Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01587
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 @ 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Mundy, Kara)
January 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant XTO Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bagnell, Nicolle)
January 23, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bagnell, Nicolle)
January 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Hess Ohio Developments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bagnell, Nicolle)
January 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant EQT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bagnell, Nicolle)
January 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ascent Resources-Utica LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bagnell, Nicolle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Antero Resources Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration) (Lusenhop, Peter)
January 22, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Hess Ohio Developments, LLC, Hess Ohio Developments, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hess Ohio Developments, LLC for Hess Ohio Developments, LLC.. (Bagnell, Nicolle)
January 11, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Gulfport Energy Corporation for Gulfport Appalachia, LLC.. (Mundy, Kara)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Mundy, Kara)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Marie Mundy for Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation (Mundy, Kara)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants XTO Energy, Inc., ExxonMobile Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ExxonMobile Corporation for XTO Energy, Inc... (Bagnell, Nicolle)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Lusenhop for Defendant Antero Resources Corporation (Lusenhop, Peter)
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hess Ohio Developments, LLC answer due 1/23/2019. (jr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, New date requested 1/23/2019. Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Hess Ohio Developments, LLC to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Plaintiffs Brent Butler, Doreen Butler, Cheryl Feiock, Ryan Feiock, J&R Passmore, LLC, Bruce Schuster, Jennifer Schuster. (Wilson, Craig) Modified on 1/8/2019 (jr).
December 22, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff J&R Passmore, LLC. (Wilson, Craig)
December 22, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Antero Resources Corporation, Antero Midstream Partners LP identifying Other Affiliate Antero Midstream Partners LP for Antero Resources Corporation.. (Batikov, Ilya)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, New date requested 1/23/2019. by Defendants Ascent Resources-Utica LLC, EQT Corporation, Hess Ohio Developments, LLC, Rice Drilling D, LLC, XTO Energy, Inc.. (Bagnell, Nicolle) Modified on 1/8/2019 (jr).
December 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ascent Resources-Utica LLC answer due 1/23/2019; EQT Corporation answer due 1/23/2019; Rice Drilling D, LLC answer due 1/23/2019. (daf)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. Rice Drilling D, LLC served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/23/2019. (daf)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Rice Drilling D, LLC, EQT Production Company identifying Corporate Parent EQT Production Company for Rice Drilling D, LLC.. (Bagnell, Nicolle)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant EQT Corporation. (Bagnell, Nicolle)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ascent Resources-Utica LLC. (Bagnell, Nicolle)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Ascent Resources-Utica LLC, EQT Corporation, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (Bagnell, Nicolle)
December 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gulfport Appalachia, LLC answer due 1/23/2019; Gulfport Energy Corporation answer due 1/23/2019. (jr)
December 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Antero Resources Corporation answer due 1/22/2019. (jr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (McGranor, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead New date requested 1/22/2019. by Defendant Antero Resources Corporation. (Batikov, Ilya) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jr).
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant EQT Corporation. The Defendant was served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (daf)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Antero Resources Corporation, Ascent Resources-Utica LLC, Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Hess Ohio Developments, LLC, XTO Energy, Inc.. Antero Resources Corporation served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Ascent Resources-Utica LLC served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Gulfport Appalachia, LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Gulfport Energy Corporation served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Hess Ohio Developments, LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; XTO Energy, Inc. served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (daf)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John F. McCuskey, Brian J. Warner, and Marc Mignault is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/17/2018. (daf)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-6716929) of John F. McCuskey, Brian J. Warner, Marc Mignault by Plaintiffs Brent Butler, Doreen Butler, Cheryl Feiock, Ryan Feiock, J&R Passmore, LLC, Bruce Schuster, Jennifer Schuster. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - John McCuskey, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Brian Warner, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Marc Mignault) (Wilson, Craig)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the Complaint and Issued Summons were sent to the named Defendants. (daf)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EQT Corporation, and Gulfport Energy Corporation. (daf)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Antero Resources Corporation, Ascent Resources-Utica LLC, EQT Corporation, Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Hess Ohio Developments, LLC, Rice Drilling D, LLC, and XTO Energy, Inc.. (daf)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6706511), filed by Ryan Feiock, Jennifer Schuster, Cheryl Feiock, Bruce Schuster, Brent Butler, J&R Passmore, LLC, Doreen Butler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - DOGRM Presentation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Well Completion Form 8, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - ODNR 2012 Geological Survey, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Portions of Horseshoe B Application, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Well Completion Records, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Well Completion Reports, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Form Summons - Rice Drilling D, LLC, #9 Summons Form Summons - EQT Corporation, #10 Summons Form Summons - Gulfport Energy Corporation, #11 Summons Form Summons - Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, #12 Summons Form Summons - XTO Energy Inc., #13 Summons Form Summons - Ascent Resources-Utica, LLC, #14 Summons Form Summons - Antero Resources Corporation, #15 Summons Form Summons - Hess Ohio Developments, LLC) (Wilson, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&R Passmore, LLC et al v. Rice Drilling D, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Appalachia, LLC
Represented By: Timothy B McGranor
Represented By: Kara Marie Mundy
Represented By: Mitchell Aaron Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice Drilling D, LLC
Represented By: Nicolle Snyder Bagnell
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: Gregory D Russell
Represented By: Peter A Lusenhop
Represented By: Ilya Batikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascent Resources-Utica LLC
Represented By: Nicolle Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT Corporation
Represented By: Nicolle Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Ohio Developments, LLC
Represented By: Nicolle Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corporation
Represented By: Timothy B McGranor
Represented By: Kara Marie Mundy
Represented By: Mitchell Aaron Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolle Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Butler
Represented By: Craig J Wilson
Represented By: Brian J Warner
Represented By: Marc Mignault
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Schuster
Represented By: Craig J Wilson
Represented By: Brian J Warner
Represented By: Marc Mignault
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&R Passmore, LLC
Represented By: Craig J Wilson
Represented By: Brian J Warner
Represented By: Marc Mignault
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Feiock
Represented By: Craig J Wilson
Represented By: Brian J Warner
Represented By: Marc Mignault
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Butler
Represented By: Craig J Wilson
Represented By: Brian J Warner
Represented By: Marc Mignault
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Schuster
Represented By: Craig J Wilson
Represented By: Brian J Warner
Represented By: Marc Mignault
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Feiock
Represented By: Craig J Wilson
Represented By: Brian J Warner
Represented By: Marc Mignault
Represented By: John F McCuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?