Coulter Ventures, LLC v. Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Coulter Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01816
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/28/2019. (sln)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This matter came before the Court on February 28, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. at the First Pretrial Conference This case is referred to the June, 2020 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 8/19/2019. Motions to Amend due by 8/19/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/1/2019. Primary Expert due by 2/14/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/14/2020. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by 3/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 28, 2019. (jlk)
February 18, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.. (Palmer Polly, Erin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Coulter Ventures, LLC. (Campbell, Drew)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTATION ORDER granting #12 #13 #14 #15 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Louis DiSanto, Erik S. Maurer, Anthony J. Denis & Eric J. Hamp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/7/2019. (er)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 & #11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Erin Palmer Polley and Gibeault C. Creson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/7/2019. (er)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Coulter Ventures, LLC. (Campbell, Drew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6779998) of Eric J. Hamp by Plaintiff Coulter Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Campbell, Drew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6779986) of Anthony J. Denis by Plaintiff Coulter Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Campbell, Drew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6779977) of Erik S. Maurer by Plaintiff Coulter Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Campbell, Drew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6779949) of Louis DiSanto by Plaintiff Coulter Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Campbell, Drew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6775243) of Gibeault Cooper Creson by Defendant Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Yurkiw, Jay)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6775203) of Erin Palmer Polly by Defendant Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Yurkiw, Jay)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc., Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. for Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc... (Yurkiw, Jay)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
January 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc. answer due 2/18/2019. (er)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.. (Yurkiw, Jay)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.. Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Campbell, Drew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc. (er)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc., d/b/a Titan Fitness, d/b/a Titan Distributors, Inc., d/b/a Titan Great Outdoors, d/b/a Titan Ramps, d/b/a Titan Attachments (Campbell, Drew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Jeffery A. Hill, Registered Agent for Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. (Campbell, Drew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Coulter Ventures, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6733657), filed by Coulter Ventures, LLC. #3 corrected version of the complaint) (sem). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sem). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2018: #5 Exhibit A) (sem). Modified on 12/31/2018 (sem).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter Ventures, LLC v. Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Manufacturing & Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Erin N. Palmer Polly
Represented By: Gibeault C. Creson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coulter Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Drew H Campbell
Represented By: Anthony J. Denis
Represented By: Erik S. Maurer
Represented By: Louis DiSanto
Represented By: Eric J. Hamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?