United States of America v. MSD Welding, Inc.

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: MSD Welding, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018mc00049
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Algenon L Marbley
3 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that the Respondent, MSD Welding, Inc. (MSD Welding) appear and Show Cause why the Respondent should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service's summons, served on Respondent on July 3, 2018. The Hearing is set for 4/3/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 220 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. It is ORDERED that this Order be personally served on Respondent MSD Welding, by an official of the Internal Revenue Service within 30 DAYS. (Due 3/17/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 15, 2019. (jlk)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring re #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America to the United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers to conduct a hearing, if necessary, and make a report and recommendation for disposition of the petition. 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/15/2019. (cw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:18-mc-48 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/11/2019. (er)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. MSD Welding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Leah M. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MSD Welding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?