Scenicview Estates, LLC v. Eclipse Resources I, LP, et al
Plaintiff: Scenicview Estates, LLC
Defendant: SEG-ECR LLC and Eclipse Resources I, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00039
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/21/2019. (agm)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the September 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2019. Motions to Amend due by 4/30/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/28/2019. Primary Expert due by 8/16/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/30/2019. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/2019. Settlement Demand due by 7/1/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/21/2019. (daf)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTATION ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, without prejudice to re-filing to challenge #14 Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/20/2019. (agm)
February 18, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scenicview Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to 1st Amended Complaint) (Fanning, Sara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT FILED by Plaintiff Scenicview Estates, LLC. (Fanning, Sara)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 2/19/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/6/2019. (agm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 2/19/2019. by Plaintiff Scenicview Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pettorini, Timothy)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Batiste Pettorini for Plaintiff Scenicview Estates, LLC (Pettorini, Timothy)
January 28, 2019 RE-NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference RE-SET for 2/21/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The conference is rescheduled for 2/21/20129at 10:30 am. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/28/2019. (agm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Originally Scheudled for 2/14/2019 by Defendants Eclipse Resources I, LP, SEG-ECR LLC. (Miller, Brant)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SEG-ECR LLC. (Miller, Brant)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Monroe County CPC by Scenicview Estates, LLC against Eclipse Resources I, LP & SEG-ECR LLC. (er)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Eclipse Resources I, LP Certificate of Compliance to Give Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) (Miller, Brant)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Eclipse Resources I, LP, Eclipse Resources Corporation, Eclipse GP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eclipse Resources Corporation, Corporate Parent Eclipse GP, LLC for Eclipse Resources I, LP.. (Miller, Brant)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Eclipse Resources I, LP, SEG-ECR LLC. (Miller, Brant)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CVH-469 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6739983), filed by Eclipse Resources I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit As Filed Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Notices) (Miller, Brant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scenicview Estates, LLC v. Eclipse Resources I, LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scenicview Estates, LLC
Represented By: Sara Elaine Fanning
Represented By: Timothy Batiste Pettorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEG-ECR LLC
Represented By: Brant T Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Resources I, LP
Represented By: Brant T Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?