L.I.S. Transport LLC v. Navistar, Inc.
Plaintiff: L.I.S. Transport LLC
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00057
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Navistar, Inc.. (McNamara, Anthony)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due no more than fourteen (14) days after resolution of #9 Motion to Remand. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/7/2019. (agm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 3/27/2019. by Plaintiff L.I.S. Transport LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Aimar, Allen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff L.I.S. Transport LLC. (Aimar, Allen)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. At the request of the parties, the conference will be reset upon resolution of #6 Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/4/2019. (agm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the February 14, 2019 Initial Pretrial Conference by Defendant Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Upton, Lindsay)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Navistar, Inc.. (Upton, Lindsay)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
January 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Navistar, Inc. answer due 1/24/2019. (agm)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Reconsideration of answer due date. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/8/2019. (agm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Reconsideration re Set/Reset Deadlines, #2 Complaint To recognize Agreed Answer Date by Defendant Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Upton, Lindsay)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to Navistar, Inc.: Answer due 1/14/2019. (ew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Navistar, Inc. originally filed in Licking County Court of Common Pleas on 12/3/2018 by L.I.S. Transport LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Licking County, case number 18CV1298 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6741122), filed by Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit) (McNamara, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.I.S. Transport LLC v. Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.I.S. Transport LLC
Represented By: Allen Basil Aimar, Jr.
Represented By: Peter Howard Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony P. McNamara
Represented By: Timothy C Ammer
Represented By: Lindsay M. Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?