Davis Stegall v. Viars et al
Plaintiff: Gina Davis Stegall
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Kourtney Viars, CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota and CTA Pizza Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00160
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:19-cv-627 and 2:19-cv-160 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on March 4, 2019. (jlk) (jlk)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/5/2019. (sln)
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants CTA Pizza Inc., Kourtney Viars. (Bentz, Audrey)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Defendants CTA Pizza Inc., Kourtney Viars Agreed Order of Protection (Burnett, John)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the June, 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2019. Motions to Amend due by 5/31/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/4/2019. Primary Expert due by 10/15/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/1/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by3/4/2019. Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2019. Settlement Demand due by 5/15/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 26, 2019. (jlk)
February 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/26/2019. (sln)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Burnett for Defendants CTA Pizza Inc., Kourtney Viars (Burnett, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants CTA Pizza Inc., Kourtney Viars. (Bentz, Audrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE IN CONFERENCE TIME: Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset to 2/26/2019 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (Previously set for 10:30 AM.) (sln)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants CTA Pizza Inc., Kourtney Viars. (Bentz, Audrey)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company filed by CTA Pizza Inc., Kourtney Viars. (Bentz, Audrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant Blue Cross Blue Sheild of Minnesota filed by CTA Pizza Inc., Kourtney Viars. (Bentz, Audrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by CTA Pizza Inc.. (Bentz, Audrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kourtney Viars. (Bentz, Audrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with CROSSCLAIM against Kourtney Viars and CTA Pizza Inc. originally filed in Gallia County Court of Common Pleas on 1/3/2019 by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota. (ew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with CROSSCLAIM against Kourtney Viars and CTA Pizza Inc. originally filed in Gallia County Court of Common Pleas on 12/14/2018 by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (ew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Record . (Janik, Steven)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CTA Pizza Inc.. (Janik, Steven)
January 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to All Defendants: Answers due 1/22/2019. (ew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kourtney Viars, CTA Pizza Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, and Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company originally filed in Gallia County Court of Common Pleas on 11/13/2018 by Gina Davis Stegall. (ew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, Gallia County, Ohio, case number 18CV000120 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6753144), filed by CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Service of Process, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Janik, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis Stegall v. Viars et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Anna Kathleen Locurto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kourtney Viars
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Represented By: John W. Burnett
Represented By: Audrey K Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota
Represented By: Erin Dwyer French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTA Pizza Inc.
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Represented By: John W. Burnett
Represented By: Audrey K Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Davis Stegall
Represented By: Michael William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?