Hunter v. Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Hunter
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, CACI International Incorporated, CACI Technologies LLC, Mission Essential Personnel, LLC, CACI Technologies Incorporated and Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00411
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Shores, David A. Higbee, Mark G. Weiss and K. Mallory Brennan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/4/2019. (er)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6866609) of Mark Weiss by Defendant Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Porter, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6866603) of K. Mallory Brennan by Defendant Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Porter, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6866598) of David Higbee by Defendant Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Porter, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6866579) of Ryan Shores by Defendant Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Porter, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 #10 #11 & #12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin E. Rayhill, Joseph R. Saveri, Steven N. Williams & Nicomedes S. Herrera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/14/2019. (er)
March 11, 2019 Filing fee for PHV Rayhill: $ 200.00, receipt number 200COL056160; for PHV Saveri: $200.00, receipt number 200COL056161; for PHV Williams: $200.00, receipt number 200COL056162; for PHV Herrera: $200.00, receipt number 200COL056163. (er)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Nicomedes S. Herrera by Plaintiff Sarah Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Judge, Shawn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Steven N. Williams by Plaintiff Sarah Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Judge, Shawn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Joseph R. Saveri by Plaintiff Sarah Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Judge, Shawn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Kevin E. Rayhill by Plaintiff Sarah Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Judge, Shawn)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation answer due 4/12/2019; Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated answer due 4/12/2019; Mission Essential Personnel, LLC answer due 4/12/2019.By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/5/2019. (agm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendants CACI International Incorporated, CACI Technologies Incorporated, CACI Technologies LLC. (Weinstein, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 4/12/2019. Joint Motion by Defendants Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated, Mission Essential Personnel, LLC. (Mundy, Kara)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (er)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (er)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named parties via certified mail. (er)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated, CACI International Incorporated, CACI Technologies Incorporated, CACI Technologies LLC & Mission Essential Personnel, LLC. (er)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6784448), filed by Sarah Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Booz Allen Corporation, #3 Summons Form Booz Allen Incorporated, #4 Summons Form CACI Incorporated, #5 Summons Form CACI LLC, #6 Summons Form CACI Technologies, Incorporated, #7 Summons Form Mission Essential Personnel, LLC) (Judge, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Weber Herlihy
Represented By: Mark G. Weiss
Represented By: David A Higbee
Represented By: K. Mallory Brennan
Represented By: Kara Marie Mundy
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Represented By: Ryan A Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACI International Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph C Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACI Technologies LLC
Represented By: Joseph C Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Essential Personnel, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Butscha, Jr.
Represented By: Robert F Ware
Represented By: Anthony C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACI Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph C Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly Weber Herlihy
Represented By: Mark G. Weiss
Represented By: David A Higbee
Represented By: K. Mallory Brennan
Represented By: Kara Marie Mundy
Represented By: William Glover Porter, II
Represented By: Ryan A Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hunter
Represented By: Shawn Kincade Judge
Represented By: Nicodemus S. Herrera
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Kevin E. Rayhill
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Mark H Troutman
Represented By: Gregory M Travalio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?