Tucker v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andre R. Tucker
Defendant: Jane Doe and Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00505
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Greyhound Lines, Inc. answer due 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 26, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint New date requested 4/29/2019. by Defendant Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fagnilli, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Greyhound Lines, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (er)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Greyhound Lines, Inc. (jlk)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 19, 2019. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jane Doe, Greyhound Lines, Inc., filed by Andre R. Tucker. (jlk)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Andre R. Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summonses to be issued, #4 Marshal forms) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Represented By: David J Fagnilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre R. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?