Royer v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Michelle Royer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00516
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security c/o Regional Chief Counsel (Chicago), U.S. Attorney General (Washington DC), and U.S. Attorney (Columbus). Served on 3/15/2019. Answer due 5/14/2019. (ew)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (daf)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michelle Royer. (daf)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Commissioner's certified copy of the Administrative Record, which shall serve as the answer, due within sixty (60) days after service. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent Form) (daf)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michelle Royer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 USM 285's) (Hall, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Royer
Represented By: Julie A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?