Miller et al v. Sanders et al
Plaintiff: Howard W Miller, Jr and Agnes M Miller
Defendant: The University of Charleston, Inc., Jonathan SQ Sanders and Quinn Sanders
Case Number: 2:2019cv00527
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jonathan SQ Sanders. Jonathan SQ Sanders served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (jlk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The University of Charleston, Inc. The University of Charleston, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (jlk)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via certified mail to the Defendants, The University of Charleston, Inc. (7013 1090 0000 9278 1170) and Jonathan S.Q. Sanders aka Quinn Sanders (7013 1090 0000 9278 1163). (jlk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The University of Charleston, Inc.. (jlk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jonathan SQ Sanders. (jlk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Yarmesch, Daniel)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Yarmesch, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6797973), filed by Howard W Miller, Jr, Agnes M Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Yarmesch, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard W Miller, Jr
Represented By: Daniel A Yarmesch
Represented By: Jonathan C Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes M Miller
Represented By: Daniel A Yarmesch
Represented By: Jonathan C Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Charleston, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan SQ Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?