Taglione et al v. Charter Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Nancy A Baker, Andrew Lucas and Robert Taglione
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00528
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, LLC, filed by Robert Taglione, Andrew Lucas, Nancy A Baker. (jlk)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Amended Complaint, which is attached Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 10, 2019. (jlk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Andrew Lucas, Robert Taglione. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) (Reeve, Gary)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/5/2019. (sln)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Confidentiality Order and Agreement To Be Bound) (Davis, Carolyn)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the September, 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2019. Motions to Amend due by 5/15/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 4/16/2019. Primary Expert due by 7/31/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/31/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Any proposed protective order or clawback agreement shall be filed with the Court by 4/5/2019. Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2020. Settlement Demand due by 11/15/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 14, 2019. (jlk)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 & #10 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel H. Gaynor and Joseph W. Ozmer, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/14/2019. (er)
March 8, 2019 NOTICE - The 3/14/2019 at 11:00 AM Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. (See ECF No. #8 .) (sln)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6828713) of by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Davis, Carolyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6828637) of by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Davis, Carolyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Robert Taglione. (Reeve, Gary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by All Defendants. (Davis, Carolyn)
February 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Charter Communications, LLC answer due 2/27/2019. (er)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PLEAD filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 2/13/2019 by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (er)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 1/11/2019 by Robert Taglione, Andrew Lucas, Nancy A Baker against Charter Communications, LLC. (er)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Carolyn)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 19CV000281 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6798029), filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Davis, Carolyn) Modified receipt no. on 2/20/2019; the other payment made with this entry was refunded to counsel (er).
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 19CV000281 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6798029), filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Davis, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taglione et al v. Charter Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A Baker
Represented By: Karen L Poling
Represented By: Gary A. Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lucas
Represented By: Karen L Poling
Represented By: Gary A. Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Taglione
Represented By: Karen L Poling
Represented By: Gary A. Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Carolyn A. Davis
Represented By: Joseph W Ozmer, II
Represented By: Daniel H. Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?