Green v. SS Transportation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley A Green
Defendant: Kaushal Express, Inc., Gurchetan Singh, Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal and SS Transportation Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00613
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., Gurchetan Singh. (Buchbinder, Robert)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Please Note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (sln)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kaushal Express, Inc.. (Buchbinder, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SS Transportation Inc.. (Buchbinder, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 Defendants SS Transportation, Inc, Abdikarim Abdirahman, Gurchetan Singh, Kaushal Express, Inc. and Anu Kaushal's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Buchbinder, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Buchbinder for Defendants Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., Gurchetan Singh (Buchbinder, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. Served on 2/25/2019; Answer due 4/26/2019. (Buchbinder, Robert) Added information concerning service and answer due dates on 3/27/2019 (er).
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #6 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #5 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green re #4 Certificate of Service Proof of Service of Subpoena (Young, Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Madison County Prosecutor's Office (Young, Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Ohio State Highway Patrol (West Jefferson Post) (Young, Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Ashley A Green Subpoena Duces Tecum to Ohio State Highway Patrol (Young, Andrew)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Ellen M. McCarthy. (daf)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Abdikarim Abdirahman, Anu Kaushal, Kaushal Express, Inc., SS Transportation Inc., and Gurchetan Singh. (daf)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6806439), filed by Ashley A Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form To SS Transportation Inc., #3 Summons Form To Kaushal Express, Inc., #4 Summons Form To Abdikarim Abdirahman, #5 Summons Form To Gurchetan Singh, #6 Summons Form To Anu Kaushal) (Young, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. SS Transportation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaushal Express, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Richard Henry
Represented By: Robert Charles Buchbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurchetan Singh
Represented By: Michael Richard Henry
Represented By: Robert Charles Buchbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdikarim Abdirahman
Represented By: Michael Richard Henry
Represented By: Robert Charles Buchbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anu Kaushal
Represented By: Michael Richard Henry
Represented By: Robert Charles Buchbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SS Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Michael Richard Henry
Represented By: Robert Charles Buchbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley A Green
Represented By: Andrew R. Young
Represented By: Don J Young, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?